Komatsu v. The City of New York
Original Case: 1:20-cv-07046
Second Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:21-cv-01114 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Apr 28, 2021 |
Terminated: | Aug 12, 2021 |
Last checked: Friday Aug 13, 2021 4:36 AM EDT |
Defendant
John Doe, 1, 10/18/17
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
The City of New York
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Howard Redmond, NYPD Inspector, sued in individual and official capacities
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Ralph Nieves, former NYPD Lieutenant, sued in individual and official capacities
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Karl Pfeffer, NYPD Officer (Officer ID #: 48458), sued in individual and official capacities
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Andrew Berkowitz, NYPD Officer (badge #: 7141), sued in individual and official capacities
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Cruz, NYPD Officer (badge #: 751), sued in individual and official capacities
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Hansen, NYPD Officer (badge #: 4028), sued in individual and official capacities
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Christopher Fowler, NYPD Officer (badge #: 3185), sued in individual and official capacities
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Rachel Atcheson, In their individual and official capacities
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Lance, NYPD Officer (badge #: 245), sued in individual and official capacities
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
John Doe, 8-30-17a NYPD Officer, sued in individual and official capacities
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Juanita Holmes, NYPD Officer, sued in individual and official capacities
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Keith Dietrich, NYPD Officer (shield #5779)
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
NYPD Officer Jane Doe, 2, 10/12/17
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
John Doe, 7, NYPD, 9/14/17, In their individual and official capacities
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
James O'Neill, former NYPD Commissioner, sued in individual and official capacities
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Raymond Gerola, NYPD Detective, Shield #6577, In their individual and official capacities
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Dustin Ridener
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
James Clynes
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
John Doe, 3, NYPD 10/26/17 All of the defendants listed above who are people are being sued in their individual and official capacities
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
John Doe, 2, NYPD 10/26/17 All of the defendants listed above who are people are being sued in their individual and official capacities
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
NYPD John Doe, 5, 3/18/19
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
NYPD Officer Zappia, Shield #4152
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
NYPD John Doe, 3/18/19
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
NYPD Officer Edward Klein
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
NYPD John Doe, 2, 3/18/19
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
NYPD John Doe, 1, 3/18/19
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
NYPD John Doe, 6, 10/25/17
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
NYPD Officer Lin, (shield #: 25714), All of the defendants listed above who are people are being sued intheir individual and official capacities
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
John Doe, 1, NYPD 10/26/17 All of the defendants listed above who are people are being sued in their individual and official capacities
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
NYPD John Doe, 5, 10/25/17
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Jessica Ramos, In their individual and official capacities
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
John Doe, #2, NYPD, 9/14/17, In their individual and official capacities
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
John Doe, 8, NYPD, 9/14/17, In their individual and official capacities
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Howard Miller
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
John Doe, 6, NYPD 9/14/17, In their individual and official capacities
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
NYPD Detective Stephen Halk
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
John Doe, #3, NYPD, 9/14/17, In their individual and official capacities
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Richard Mantellino, NYPD Lieutenant, sued in his individual and official capacities
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
John Doe, 1, 9/14/17
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
John Doe, 2, 9/14/17
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
Bill de Blasio, sued in individual and official capacities
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Nicholas Mason, NYPD Detective, Shield #6995, In their individual and official capacities
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Keck, NYPD Officer (shield #6313)
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
John Doe, #4, NYPD, 9/14/17, In their individual and official capacities
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Mitchell, NYPD Officer, Shield #5486, In their individual and official capacities
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Brad Lander, All of the defendants listed above who are people are being sued in their individual and official capacities
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
Eric Phillips
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
John Doe, 1, NYPD Officer, 9/14/17, Shield #21250, In their individual and official capacities
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
John Doe, #5, NYPD, 9/14/17, In their individual and official capacities
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
NYPD John Doe, 3, 10/25/17
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Baez, NYPD Officer (shield #5984)
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Satana, NYPD Officer (shield #7291)
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Pinny Ringel
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
Nick Gulotta
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
John Doe, 3, 9/26/17
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
John Doe, 1, Tablet 9/26/17
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
Gale Brewer
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
Jane Doe, 1, 10/12/17
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
Jerry Ioveno, NYPD Officer (shield #5560)
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
John Doe, 1, NYPD Officer 9/26/17
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Jane Doe, 2, NYPD Officer 9/26/17
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Jane Doe, 3, NYPD Officer 9/26/17
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
John Doe, 2, NYPD Officer 9/26/17
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
John Doe, 1, NYPD Officer 9/27/17
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
John Doe, 2, NYPD Officer 9/27/17
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
John Doe, 3, NYPD Officer 9/27/17
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
John Doe, NYPD Officer 9/27/17
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Kalman Yeger, All of the defendants listed above who are people are being sued in their individual and official capacities
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
Keith Powers, All of the defendants listed above who are people are being sued in their individual and official capacities
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
Jane Doe, 11/13/19, All of the defendants listed above who are people are being sued in their individual and official capacities
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
NYPD John Doe, 2, 10/25/17
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
John Doe, 1, NYPD Officer 9/28/17
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
John Doe, 2, NYPD Officer 9/28/17
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
John Doe, 3, NYPD Officer 9/28/20
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
John Doe, 4, NYPD Officer 9/28/17
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
NYPD Officer John Doe, 1, 10/4/17, sued in their individual and official capacities
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
NYPD Officer John Doe, 2, 10/4/17, sued in their individual and official capacities
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Rafael Perez, All of the defendants listed above who are people are being sued in their individual and official capacities
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
NYPD John Doe, 2, 11/27/17, All of the defendants listed above who are people are being sued in their individual and official capacities
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
John Doe, 2, 10/4/17, sued in their individual and official capacities
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
Bronx District Attorney John Doe, Bodyguard, sued in their individual and official capacities
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Cyrus R. Vance, Jr., sued in their individual and official capacities
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Lawrence Byrne, Jr., sued in their individual and official capacities
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
Galante, NYPD Detective All of the defendants listed above who are people are being sued in their individual and official capacities
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Shauna Stribula
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
NYPD Officer Ranieri, Shield # 24361
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
NYPD Officer Suzuki, Shield # 7373
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
NYPD Officer John Doe, 1, 10/12/17
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
NYPD Officer John Doe, 2, 10/12/17
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
NYPD Officer John Doe, 3, 10/12/17
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
John Doe, 4, 10/12/17
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
NYPD Officer Jerry Ioveno
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
John Doe, 5, 10/12/17
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
NYPD Officer John Doe, 6, 10/12/17
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Officer Jane Doe, 1, 10/12/17
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
NYPD Officer Jemaal Gungor
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
NYPD Officer Jane Doe, 3, 10/12/17
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
NYPD Officer Jane Doe, 4, 10/12/17
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
NYPD John Doe, 2, 10/18/17
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
NYPD Officer John Doe, 10/18/17
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
NYPD John Doe, 3, 10/12/17
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
NYPD Sergeant Jordan Mazur
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
NYPD Sergeant Ryan Dwyer
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Letitia A. James, All of the defendants listed above who are people are being sued in their individual and official capacities
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Ritchie Torres, All of the defendants listed above who are people are being sued intheir individual and official capacities
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Sergeant Bradley, All of the defendants listed above who are people are being sued intheir individual and official capacities
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
NYPD John Doe, 4, 10/12/17
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
NYPD Officer Barker, Shield #13845
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
NYPD John Doe, 5, 10/12/17
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
NYPD John Doe, 4, 10/25/17
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
NYPD John Doe, 6, 10/18/17
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Marco Carrion
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
NYPD Officer Joe Ventri
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
NYPD John Doe, 1, 10/25/17
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Anthony Shorris, All of the defendants listed above who are people are being sued in their individual and official capacities
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
NYPD John Doe, 1, 11/2/17, All of the defendants listed above who are people are being sued intheir individual and official capacities
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
NYPD Officer John Doe, 1, 11/27/17, All of the defendants listed above who are people are being sued in their individual and official capacities
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Diana Ayala, All of the defendants listed above who are people are being sued intheir individual and official capacities
|
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Towaki Komatsu
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 08/13/2021 4:31 AM EDT |
Wednesday, April 28, 2021 | ||
1 | 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Towaki Komatsu, FILED. [3091349] 21-1114 [Entered: 05/03/2021 09:20 AM] | |
Att: 1 2 pgs Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax | ||
Att: 2 33 pgs Case FILED | ||
2 | 2 2 pgs DISTRICT COURT MEMO ENDORSEMENT, dated 04/26/2021, RECEIVED.[3091368] 21-1114 [Entered: 05/03/2021 09:26 AM] | |
3 | 3 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[3091371] 21-1114 [Entered: 05/03/2021 09:27 AM] | |
Att: 1 1 pgs Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed | ||
Att: 2 32 pgs Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED |