In re: New York City Board
Original Case: 1:96-cv-08414
Second Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:21-cv-01118 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Case Filed: | Apr 30, 2021 |
Terminated: | Dec 03, 2021 |
Last checked: Monday Dec 06, 2021 3:30 AM EST |
Defendant
New York State Education Department
|
|
Defendant - Appellant
Board of Education of the City School District of the City of New York
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Elsa Gulino
|
|
Plaintiff
Mayling Ralph
|
|
Plaintiff
Peter Wilds
|
|
Plaintiff
Nia Greene, on behalf of themselves and all others similarly situated
|
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Mojeed Azeez
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 12/06/2021 3:27 AM EST |
Friday, April 30, 2021 | ||
1 | 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Board of Education of the City School District of the City of New York, FILED. [3091547] 21-1118 [Entered: 05/03/2021 11:05 AM] | |
Att: 1 2 pgs Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax | ||
Att: 2 1924 pgs Case FILED | ||
2 | 2 2 pgs DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 04/01/2021, RECEIVED.[3091557] 21-1118 [Entered: 05/03/2021 11:09 AM] |