In re: New York City Board of
Original Case: 1:96-cv-08414
Second Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:21-cv-01159 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Case Filed: | Apr 30, 2021 |
Terminated: | Dec 29, 2021 |
Last checked: Thursday Dec 30, 2021 3:34 AM EST |
Defendant
New York State Education Department
|
|
Defendant - Appellant
Board of Education of the City School District of the City of New York
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Elsa Gulino
|
|
Plaintiff
Mayling Ralph
|
|
Plaintiff
Peter Wilds
|
|
Plaintiff
Nia Greene, on behalf of themselves and all others similarly situated
|
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Javier Ortiz
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 12/30/2021 3:28 AM EST |
Friday, April 30, 2021 | ||
1 | 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Board of Education of the City School District of the City of New York, FILED. [3091920] 21-1159 [Entered: 05/03/2021 02:35 PM] | |
Att: 1 2 pgs Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax | ||
Att: 2 1930 pgs Case FILED | ||
2 | 2 2 pgs DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 04/01/2021, RECEIVED.[3091927] 21-1159 [Entered: 05/03/2021 02:40 PM] |