Roe v. St. John's University
Original Case: 1:19-cv-04694
Second Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:21-cv-01125 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 448 Civil Rights - Education |
Case Filed: | Apr 30, 2021 |
Terminated: | Jan 31, 2024 |
Last checked: Thursday Feb 01, 2024 4:01 AM EST |
Defendant - Appellee
St. John's University
|
Represented By
|
Defendant-Counter-Claimant - Appellee
Jane Doe
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff-Counter-Defendant - Appellant
Richard Roe
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 02/01/2024 4:00 AM EST |
Friday, April 30, 2021 | ||
1 | 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Richard Roe, FILED. [3091478] 21-1125 [Entered: 05/03/2021 10:32 AM] | |
Att: 1 2 pgs Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax | ||
Att: 2 8 pgs Case FILED | ||
2 | 2 1 pgs DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 03/31/2021, RECEIVED.[3091483] 21-1125 [Entered: 05/03/2021 10:36 AM] | |
3 | 3 PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant Richard Roe, district court receipt # ANYEDC-14426016, FILED.[3091485] 21-1125 [Entered: 05/03/2021 10:37 AM] | |
4 | 4 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[3091490] 21-1125 [Entered: 05/03/2021 10:38 AM] | |
Att: 1 1 pgs Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed | ||
Att: 2 9 pgs Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED |