Trisvan v. Burger King Worldwide, Inc.
Original Case: 1:19-cv-06396
Second Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:21-cv-01173 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Case Filed: | May 03, 2021 |
Terminated: | Nov 15, 2021 |
Last checked: Tuesday Nov 16, 2021 3:35 AM EST |
Defendant
Burger King Worldwide, Inc.
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
Restaurant Brands International
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Tim Hortons Incorporated
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Burger King Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
John Trisvan
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 11/16/2021 3:29 AM EST |
Monday, May 03, 2021 | ||
1 | 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant John Trisvan, FILED. [3092147] 21-1173 [Entered: 05/03/2021 04:32 PM] | |
Att: 1 2 pgs Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax | ||
Att: 2 4 pgs Case FILED | ||
2 | 2 17 pgs DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 03/30/2021, RECEIVED.[3092153] 21-1173 [Entered: 05/03/2021 04:35 PM] | |
3 | 3 2 pgs DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 03/31/2021, RECEIVED.[3092156] 21-1173 [Entered: 05/03/2021 04:36 PM] | |
4 | 4 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[3092158] 21-1173 [Entered: 05/03/2021 04:36 PM] | |
Att: 1 1 pgs Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed | ||
Att: 2 3 pgs Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED | ||
5 | 5 1 pgs INSTRUCTIONAL FORMS, to Pro Se litigant, SENT.[3092161] 21-1173 [Entered: 05/03/2021 04:38 PM] |