Reyes v. NewYork-Presbyterian Hospital
Original Case: 1:20-cv-03046
Second Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:21-cv-01179 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Case Filed: | Apr 29, 2021 |
Terminated: | Jul 07, 2021 |
Last checked: Thursday Jul 08, 2021 4:31 AM EDT |
Defendant - Appellee
NewYork-Presbyterian Hospital
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Dr. Manmee K. Mailk
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Dr. Jerry Chang
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Dr. Akkamma Ravi
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Maria Esther Reyes
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 07/08/2021 4:27 AM EDT |
Thursday, April 29, 2021 | ||
1 | 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Maria Esther Reyes, FILED. [3092342] 21-1179 [Entered: 05/04/2021 09:01 AM] | |
Att: 1 2 pgs Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax | ||
Att: 2 4 pgs Case FILED | ||
2 | 2 1 pgs DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 04/06/2021, RECEIVED.[3092371] 21-1179 [Entered: 05/04/2021 09:12 AM] | |
3 | 3 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[3092376] 21-1179 [Entered: 05/04/2021 09:14 AM] | |
Att: 1 1 pgs Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed | ||
Att: 2 3 pgs Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED |