Gencarelli v. The Coca-Cola Company
Original Case: 1:20-cv-00085
Second Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:21-cv-01068 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Apr 30, 2021 |
Terminated: | Aug 12, 2021 |
Last checked: Friday Aug 13, 2021 4:34 AM EDT |
Defendant
Liberty Coca-Cola Beverages
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
The Coca-Cola Company
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
James Gencarelli
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 08/13/2021 4:30 AM EDT |
Friday, April 30, 2021 | ||
1 | 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant James Gencarelli, FILED. [3093380] 21-1068 [Entered: 05/04/2021 09:12 PM] | |
Att: 1 2 pgs Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax | ||
Att: 2 16 pgs Case FILED | ||
2 | 2 7 pgs DISTRICT COURT TEXT ORDER, dated 04/19/2021, entered as docket entry 75, RECEIVED.[3093382] 21-1068 [Entered: 05/04/2021 09:17 PM] | |
4 | 4 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[3093386] 21-1068 [Entered: 05/04/2021 09:25 PM] | |
Att: 1 1 pgs Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed | ||
Att: 2 8 pgs Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED |