CCR International, Inc. v. Elias Group, LLC
Original Case: 1:15-cv-06563
Second Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:21-cv-01191 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 840 Property Rights - Trademark |
Case Filed: | May 04, 2021 |
Terminated: | Aug 04, 2021 |
Last checked: Thursday Aug 05, 2021 4:31 AM EDT |
Defendant
Coco Rico, LLC
|
|
Defendant
The Honickman Affiliates, LTD
|
|
Defendant
Kersia Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Good-O Beverages, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Richard Hahn
|
|
Defendant
Shirley Hahn
|
|
Defendant
Judicial Entity ABC
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
Elias Group, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jose Fuertes
|
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
CCR International, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
CCR Development Group, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 08/05/2021 4:29 AM EDT |
Tuesday, May 04, 2021 | ||
1 | 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellants CCR Development Group, Inc. and CCR International, Inc., FILED. [3093407] 21-1191 [Entered: 05/04/2021 11:53 PM] | |
Att: 1 2 pgs Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax | ||
Att: 2 34 pgs Case FILED | ||
2 | 2 13 pgs DISTRICT COURT OPINION AND ORDER, dated 04/05/2021, RECEIVED.[3093408] 21-1191 [Entered: 05/04/2021 11:55 PM] | |
3 | 3 2 pgs DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 04/14/2021, RECEIVED.[3093409] 21-1191 [Entered: 05/04/2021 11:55 PM] | |
4 | 4 PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellants CCR Development Group, Inc. and CCR International, Inc., district court receipt # ANYSDC-24489706, FILED.[3093410] 21-1191 [Entered: 05/04/2021 11:56 PM] | |
5 | 5 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[3093411] 21-1191 [Entered: 05/04/2021 11:56 PM] | |
Att: 1 1 pgs Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed | ||
Att: 2 34 pgs Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED |