Swint v. Mueller
Original Case: 1:21-cv-02966
Second Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:21-cv-01193 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | May 04, 2021 |
Terminated: | Jun 29, 2021 |
Last checked: Wednesday Jun 30, 2021 4:36 AM EDT |
Defendant - Appellee
Robert S. Mueller, III
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
Fallout 76
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
John W. Dean, III
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
Hurricane Sandy
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
New York Times
|
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Robert James Swint
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Chrystal Marie Meyer
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
James Stanley Dean
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Sandra Marie Lawlor
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 06/30/2021 4:30 AM EDT |
Tuesday, May 04, 2021 | ||
1 | 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant James Stanley Dean, Sandra Marie Lawlor, Chrystal Marie Meyer and Robert James Swint, FILED. [3093488] 21-1193 [Entered: 05/05/2021 08:48 AM] | |
Att: 1 2 pgs Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax | ||
Att: 2 4 pgs Case FILED | ||
2 | 2 2 pgs DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 04/13/2021, RECEIVED.[3093493] 21-1193 [Entered: 05/05/2021 08:53 AM] | |
3 | 3 1 pgs DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 04/13/2021, RECEIVED.[3093494] 21-1193 [Entered: 05/05/2021 08:54 AM] |