Velez v. Cuomo
Original Case: 1:20-cv-01584
Second Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:21-cv-01195 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | May 04, 2021 |
Terminated: | Aug 26, 2021 |
Last checked: Friday Aug 27, 2021 4:41 AM EDT |
Defendant - Appellee
Governor Andrew Cuomo
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Mayor Bill de Blasio
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Gavin Newsom, Governor of California
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Jay Inslee, Governor of Washington
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Gretchen Whitmore, Governor of Michigan
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Tony Evers, Governor of Wisconsin
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Tom Wolf, Governor of Pennsylvania
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Bianca Velez, Mommy's Me Time
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 08/27/2021 4:35 AM EDT |
Tuesday, May 04, 2021 | ||
1 | 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Bianca Velez, FILED. [3093838] 21-1195 [Entered: 05/05/2021 11:32 AM] | |
Att: 1 2 pgs Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax | ||
Att: 2 10 pgs Case FILED | ||
2 | 2 3 pgs DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 04/19/2021, RECEIVED.[3093871] 21-1195 [Entered: 05/05/2021 11:45 AM] | |
3 | 3 2 pgs DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 04/19/2021, RECEIVED.[3093875] 21-1195 [Entered: 05/05/2021 11:47 AM] | |
4 | 4 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[3093877] 21-1195 [Entered: 05/05/2021 11:47 AM] | |
Att: 1 1 pgs Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed | ||
Att: 2 4 pgs Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED |