Marquez v. Hoffman
Original Case: 1:18-cv-07315
Second Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:21-cv-01197 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | May 04, 2021 |
Terminated: | Sep 02, 2021 |
Last checked: Friday Sep 03, 2021 4:29 AM EDT |
Defendant
Denis Reo, individually
|
|
Defendant
The New York State Unified Court System
|
|
Defendant
Lucian Chalfen, Individually
|
|
Defendant
The State of New York
|
|
Defendant
Janet DiFiore, individually and in her official capacity as Chief Judge of New York State
|
|
Defendant
Rowan Wilson, individually
|
|
Defendant
Leslie Stein, individually
|
|
Defendant
Jenny Rivera, individually
|
|
Defendant
Michael Garcia, individually
|
|
Defendant
Paul Feinman, individually
|
|
Defendant
Eugene Fahey, individually
|
|
Defendant
Lori Sattler, individually
|
|
Defendant
Kay-Ann Porter, individually
|
|
Defendant
Saliann Scarpulla
|
|
Defendant
Douglas Hoffman, individually
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
Lisa Evans, individually
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Lauren DeSole, individually
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
John McConnell, individually
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Lawrence Marks, individually
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
George Silver, individually
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Alexis Marquez
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/03/2021 4:27 AM EDT |
Tuesday, May 04, 2021 | ||
1 | 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Alexis Marquez, FILED. [3093937] 21-1197 [Entered: 05/05/2021 12:12 PM] | |
Att: 1 2 pgs Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax | ||
Att: 2 37 pgs Case FILED | ||
2 | 2 1 pgs DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 04/02/2021, RECEIVED.[3093943] 21-1197 [Entered: 05/05/2021 12:16 PM] | |
3 | 3 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[3093945] 21-1197 [Entered: 05/05/2021 12:16 PM] | |
Att: 1 1 pgs Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed | ||
Att: 2 37 pgs Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED | ||
4 | 4 1 pgs INSTRUCTIONAL FORMS, to Pro Se litigant, SENT.[3093952] 21-1197 [Entered: 05/05/2021 12:19 PM] |