Acevedo v. Harvard Maintenance Company
Original Case: 1:20-cv-00721
Second Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:21-cv-01200 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Case Filed: | May 04, 2021 |
Terminated: | Jun 21, 2021 |
Last checked: Tuesday Jun 22, 2021 4:30 AM EDT |
Defendant - Appellee
Harvard Maintenance Company
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Servete Drazhi, Supervisor
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Marcos Acevedo
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 06/22/2021 4:25 AM EDT |
Tuesday, May 04, 2021 | ||
1 | 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Marcos Acevedo, FILED. [3094026] 21-1200 [Entered: 05/05/2021 01:10 PM] | |
Att: 1 2 pgs Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax | ||
Att: 2 7 pgs Case FILED | ||
2 | 2 19 pgs DISTRICT COURT MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER, dated 03/21/2021, RECEIVED.[3094033] 21-1200 [Entered: 05/05/2021 01:13 PM] | |
3 | 3 1 pgs DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 03/31/2021, RECEIVED.[3094034] 21-1200 [Entered: 05/05/2021 01:14 PM] | |
4 | 4 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[3094036] 21-1200 [Entered: 05/05/2021 01:15 PM] | |
Att: 1 1 pgs Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed | ||
Att: 2 6 pgs Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED |