New York Southern District Court
Judge:Katherine B Forrest
Case #: 1:14-cv-05107
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1981 Equal Rights Under the Law
Case Filed:Jul 09, 2014
Terminated:May 26, 2015
Last checked: Sunday May 10, 2015 4:59 PM EDT
Defendant
The Northwestern Mutual Life Insurance Company, Inc.
Represented By
John A Haase
Godfrey & Kahn, S.C
contact info
Paul F. Heaton
Godfrey & Kahn, S.C
contact info
Brendan Thomas Killeen
Morgan, Lewis & Bockius Llp (new York)
contact info
Christopher Alan Parlo
Morgan, Lewis & Bockius Llp (new York)
contact info
Plaintiff
Ruben Juarez
Represented By
Veronica Cortez
Mexican American Legal Defense And Educational Fund
contact info
Ossai Miazad
Outten & Golden,llp (nyc)
contact info
Olivia J. Quinto
Outten & Golden,llp (nyc)
contact info
Lewis M. Steel
Outten & Golden,llp (nyc)
contact info
Michael Noah Litrownik
Outten & Golden,llp (nyc)
contact info
Adam T Klein
Outten & Golden,llp (nyc)
contact info
Victor Viramontes
contact info
Thomas Andrew Saenz
Maldef
contact info
Katrina L. Eiland
Outten & Golden LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Thursday, June 04, 2015
70 70 appeal USCA Mandate Thu 4:53 PM
MANDATE of USCA (Certified Copy) USCA Case Number 15-790. The parties in the above-referenced case have filed a stipulation withdrawing this appeal pursuant to FRAP 42. The stipulation is hereby "So Ordered". Catherine O'Hagan Wolfe, Clerk USCA for the Second Circuit. Issued As Mandate: 06/04/2015. (nd)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 01, 2015
69 69 order Stipulation and Order of Voluntary Dismissal Mon 4:38 PM
STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL: The parties, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii), through their respective, authorized counsel, hereby stipulate to the dismissal of this action with prejudice, and with each of the parties to bear their own fees, costs, and expenses. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Katherine B. Forrest on 6/01/2015) (ama)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Transcript Deadlines Mon 4:39 PM
Terminate Transcript Deadlines (ama)
Related: [-]