Connolly et al v. Wyeth-Ayerst Laboratories, Inc. et al
Georgia Northern District Court | |
Judge: | William C O'Kelley |
Case #: | 2:14-cv-00152 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1331 Fed. Question: Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Jul 10, 2014 |
Terminated: | Dec 23, 2014 |
Last checked: Saturday May 09, 2015 7:43 PM EDT |
Defendant
Barr Laboratories, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Sandoz Pharmaceuticals Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lisa Chandler
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Maureen A. Connolly
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sharon Mooney
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Wyeth-Ayerst Laboratories, Inc.
Terminated: 10/14/2014
|
Docket last updated: 10 hours ago |
Wednesday, April 15, 2015 | ||
37 | 37
appeal
USCA Order
Wed 04/15 10:38 AM
Certified copy of ORDER of USCA re:30 Notice of Appeal filed by Sharon Mooney, Lisa Chandler, Maureen A. Connolly. The appeal is DISMISSED for lack of jurisdiction. All outstanding motions are DENIED as moot. Case Appealed to USCA, 11th Circuit Case Number 15-10718 CC. (sk) |
|
Tuesday, March 03, 2015 | ||
36 | 36
appeal
USCA Acknowledgment (other)
Tue 03/03 1:01 PM
USCA Acknowledgment re30 Notice of Appeal filed by Sharon Mooney, Lisa Chandler, Maureen A. Connolly. Case Appealed to USCA, 11th Circuit Case Number 15-10718 CC. (sk) |
|
appeal
Appeal Record Certified
Tue 03/03 3:43 PM
Pursuant to F.R.A.P.11(c), the Clerk certifies that the record is complete for purposes of this appeal,30 Notice of Appeal. Case Appealed to USCA, 11th Circuit Case Number 15-10718 CC. The entire record on appeal is available electronically. (rsg) |
||
Friday, February 27, 2015 | ||
appeal
Appeal Remark
Fri 02/27 8:45 AM
Appeal Remark re30 Notice of Appeal. Transmission has not been acknowledged. Pacer searched for Eleventh Circuit Case Number and added to docket. (Case Appealed to USCA, 11th Circuit Case Number 15-10718 ) (sk) |
||
Tuesday, February 17, 2015 | ||
35 | 35
appeal
Transcript Order Form
Tue 02/17 2:02 PM
TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM re30 Notice of Appeal. Certificate of Readiness due on 3/3/2015. (rsg) |
|
Friday, February 06, 2015 | ||
34 | 34
appeal
Documents forwarded to USCA
Fri 02/06 11:24 AM
Documents forwarded to USCA re Payment of Appeal Fees filed by Sharon Mooney, Lisa Chandler, Maureen A. Connolly. (sk) |
|
appeal
Payment of Appeal Fees online
Fri 02/06 11:04 AM
Payment of Appeal Fees re30 Notice of Appeal by Lisa Chandler, Maureen A. Connolly, Sharon Mooney. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 113E-5645709. (Brooks, Todd) |
||
Wednesday, February 04, 2015 | ||
33 | 33
appeal
Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA
Wed 02/04 4:37 PM
Transmission of Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal, Judgment, Order and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re30 Notice of Appeal. (sk) |
|
32 | 32
notice
Notice of Filing
Wed 02/04 4:35 PM
NOTICE Of Filing Transmission Notice to USCA, 11th Circuit re30 Notice of Appeal. (sk) |
|
31 | 31
notice
Notice (Other)
Wed 02/04 4:33 PM
NOTICE to attorney re appeal fee and appeal information sheet requirements as to30 Notice of Appeal filed. (sk) |
|
30 | 30
appeal
Notice of Appeal
Wed 02/04 4:21 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL as to28 Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Lisa Chandler, Maureen A. Connolly, Sharon Mooney. Transcript Order Form due on 2/18/2015 (Brooks, Todd) |
|
Tuesday, December 23, 2014 | ||
29 | 29
misc
Judgment - Clerk
Tue 12/23 4:47 PM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT in favor of defendants Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc. and Barr Laboratories, Inc. against Plaintiffs. (sk)--Please refer to http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov to obtain an appeals jurisdiction checklist-- |
|
28 | 28
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
Tue 12/23 4:37 PM
ORDER granting Defendants Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc. and Barr Laboratories, Inc.'s22 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge William C. O'Kelley on 12/23/14. (sk) |
|
utility
Terminate Civil Case
Tue 12/23 4:40 PM
Civil Case Terminated. (sk) |
||
Wednesday, October 15, 2014 | ||
Submission of22 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , submitted to District Judge William C. O'Kelley. (sk) | ||
Tuesday, October 14, 2014 | ||
27 | 27 REPLY BRIEF re22 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Barr Laboratories, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc..(Hollis, James) | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
26 | 26 ORDER granting21 Motion to Dismiss Defendant Wyeth Pharmaceuticals, Inc. without prejudice; terminating Wyeth-Ayerst Laboratories, Inc. Signed by Judge William C. O'Kelley on 10/14/14. (sk) | |
Wednesday, October 01, 2014 | ||
Submission of21 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Wyeth-Ayerst WITHOUT PREJUDICE , submitted to District Judge William C. O'Kelley. (sk) | ||
Tuesday, September 30, 2014 | ||
25 | 25 RESPONSE in Opposition re22 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Lisa Chandler, Maureen A. Connolly, Sharon Mooney. (Brooks, Todd) | |
Monday, September 29, 2014 | ||
ORAL ORDER granting24 Motion to Stay Deadlines (to hold the initial conference pursuant to FRCP 26(f) and Local Rule 16.1, to complete Initial Disclosures, and to complete the Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan) to 45 days from the filing of the Court's Order on Defendant's motion to dismiss. ORDERED by Judge William C. O'Kelley on 09/29/2014. (dww) | ||
Friday, September 26, 2014 | ||
24 | 24 Joint MOTION to Stay Deadlines by Barr Laboratories, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc..(Hollis, James) | |
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Monday, September 15, 2014 | ||
23 | 23 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Barr Laboratories, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Corporate Parent Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd. for Barr Laboratories, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc.. (Hollis, James) | |
22 | 22 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM with Brief In Support by Barr Laboratories, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc..(Hollis, James) | |
Att: 1 Brief | ||
Friday, September 12, 2014 | ||
21 | 21 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Wyeth-Ayerst WITHOUT PREJUDICE by Lisa Chandler, Maureen A. Connolly, Sharon Mooney. (Brooks, Todd) | |
Thursday, September 04, 2014 | ||
20 | 20 ORDER APPROVING19 APPLICATION for Admission of Gina Marie Saelinger Pro Hac Vice for Barr Laboratories, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc. Signed by Judge William C. O'Kelley on 09/04/14. (sk) | |
Wednesday, September 03, 2014 | ||
APPROVAL by Clerks Office re:19 APPLICATION for Admission of Gina Marie Saelinger Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-5366406). Attorney Gina Marie Saelinger added appearing on behalf of Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc. (pb) | ||
Wednesday, August 27, 2014 | ||
19 | 19 APPLICATION for Admission of Gina Marie Saelinger Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-5366406)by Barr Laboratories, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc..(Hollis, James) | |
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, August 07, 2014 | ||
Clerks Certificate of Mailing as to plaintiffs to Justin L. Williams and Michael E. Gurley, Jr. re15 Order17 Order and16 Order. (bdb) | ||
Wednesday, August 06, 2014 | ||
18 | 18 ORDER granting11 Application for Admission Edward Kirksey Wood, Jr. Pro Hac Vice for plaintiffs. Signed by Judge William C. O'Kelley on 8/6/2014. (bdb) | |
17 | 17 ORDER granting10 Application for Admission Michael E. Gurley Pro Hac Vice for plaintiffs. Signed by Judge William C. O'Kelley on 8/6/2014. (bdb) | |
16 | 16 ORDER granting9 Application for Admission of Justin L. Williams Pro Hac Vice for plaintiffs. Signed by Judge William C. O'Kelley on 8/6/2014. (bdb) | |
15 | 15 ORDER granting13 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Sean Robert Kasper terminated as to party plaintiffs. Signed by Judge William C. O'Kelley on 8/6/2014. (bdb) | |
Monday, August 04, 2014 | ||
14 | 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Todd C. Brooks on behalf of Lisa Chandler, Maureen A. Connolly, Sharon Mooney (Brooks, Todd) | |
Friday, August 01, 2014 | ||
13 | 13 MOTION to Withdraw Sean Robert Kasper as Attorneyby Lisa Chandler, Maureen A. Connolly, Merlin A. Connolly, Sharon Mooney.(Kasper, Sean) | |
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order | ||
12 | 12 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand, filed by Sharon Mooney, Maureen A. Connolly, Lisa Chandler, Merlin A. Connolly.(Brooks, Todd) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. | |
APPROVAL by Clerks Office re:9 APPLICATION for Admission of Justin L. Williams Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Justin L. Williams added appearing on behalf of Lisa Chandler, Maureen A. Connolly, Merlin A. Connolly (pb) | ||
APPROVAL by Clerks Office re:10 APPLICATION for Admission of Michael E. Gurley Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Michael E. Gurley, Jr added appearing on behalf of Lisa Chandler, Maureen A. Connolly, Merlin A. Connolly (pb) | ||
APPROVAL by Clerks Office re:11 APPLICATION for Admission of Edward Kirksey Wood, Jr. Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Edward Kirksey Wood added appearing on behalf of Lisa Chandler, Maureen A. Connolly, Merlin A. Connolly (pb) | ||
Thursday, July 31, 2014 | ||
11 | 11 APPLICATION for Admission of Edward Kirksey Wood, Jr. Pro Hac Vice by Lisa Chandler, Maureen A. Connolly, Merlin A. Connolly. (Catts, Austin) | |
10 | 10 APPLICATION for Admission of Michael E. Gurley Pro Hac Vice by Lisa Chandler, Maureen A. Connolly, Merlin A. Connolly. (Catts, Austin) | |
9 | 9 APPLICATION for Admission of Justin L. Williams Pro Hac Vice by Lisa Chandler, Maureen A. Connolly, Merlin A. Connolly. (Catts, Austin) | |
Wednesday, July 30, 2014 | ||
RETURN of6 APPLICATION for Admission of Edward Kirksey Wood, Jr. Pro Hac Vice to attorney for correction re: local counsel. (pb) | ||
RETURN of7 APPLICATION for Admission of Michael E. Gurley, Jr. Pro Hac Vice to attorney for correction re: local counsel. (pb) | ||
RETURN of8 APPLICATION for Admission of Justin L. Williams Pro Hac Vice to attorney for correction re: local counsel. (pb) | ||
Tuesday, July 29, 2014 | ||
8 | 8 APPLICATION for Admission of Justin L. Williams Pro Hac Vice by Lisa Chandler, Maureen A. Connolly, Merlin A. Connolly. Filing Fee received $150.00, Receipt #GAN200003023. (vld) | |
Friday, July 25, 2014 | ||
7 | 7 APPLICATION for Admission of Michael E. Gurley, Jr. Pro Hac Viceby Lisa Chandler, Maureen A. Connolly, Merlin A. Connolly.Filing Fee received $150.00, Receipt #GAN200003019.(sk) | |
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
6 | 6 APPLICATION for Admission of Edward Kirksey Wood, Jr. Pro Hac Viceby Lisa Chandler, Maureen A. Connolly, Merlin A. Connolly.Filing Fee received $150.00, Receipt #GAN200003019.(sk) | |
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Friday, July 11, 2014 | ||
5 | 5 Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements for Justin L. Williams. Clerk to follow-up by 8/11/2014. (vld) | |
4 | 4 Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements for Michael E. Gurley, Jr. Clerk to follow-up by 8/11/2014. (vld) | |
3 | 3 Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements for E. Kirk Wood. Clerk to follow-up by 8/11/2014. (vld) | |
2 | 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Barr Laboratories, Inc., Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation, Sandoz Pharmaceuticals Corporation, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc., Wyeth-Ayerst Laboratories, Inc. (vld) | |
Att: 1 Summons for Ms. Jennifer Fuller-Ricciardi, | ||
Att: 2 Summons for Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corp., | ||
Att: 3 Summons for Sandoz Pharmaceuticals Corp., | ||
Att: 4 Summons for Wyeth-Ayerst Laboratories, Inc. | ||
Thursday, July 10, 2014 | ||
1 | 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed and summon(s) issued (Filing fee $400, receipt number 113E-5283061), filed by Sharon Mooney, Maureen A. Connolly, Lisa Chandler, Merlin A. Connolly.(vld) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |