Ries v. Gustner
Minnesota District Court | |
Judge: | Joan N Ericksen |
Case #: | 0:12-cv-01629 |
Nature of Suit | 423 Bankruptcy - Withdrawal 28 USC 157 |
Cause | 28:0157 Transfer of Adversary Proceeding |
Case Filed: | Jul 05, 2012 |
Terminated: | Aug 02, 2012 |
Last checked: Friday Jun 10, 2016 5:54 PM CDT |
Defendant
James D. Gustner
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
US Trustee
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Lori Anne Vosejpka
Clerk, U. S. Bankruptcy Court 300 South 4th Street, Room 301
Minneapolis, MN 55415 |
|
Plaintiff
Charles W. Ries
|
Represented By
|
GPO
Aug 02 2012
ORDER remand to Bankruptcy Court(Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Joan N. Ericksen on August 2, 2012. (slf) |