Amado Munoz et al v. American Honda Motor Co., Inc. et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Josephine L Staton |
Referred: | Karen E Scott |
Case #: | 2:21-cv-04030 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract |
Case Filed: | May 13, 2021 |
Terminated: | Aug 03, 2021 |
Last checked: Tuesday Nov 09, 2021 12:54 AM PST |
Defendant
American Honda Motor Co., Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Honda North America, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Frank Costobile
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Rachel Fairchild
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Carolyn Heier
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ben Hu
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Amado Munoz
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Matthew Robinson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael Schwartz
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James Tillery
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lingyan Yin
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Gary Tetrault
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 1 hours ago |
Tuesday, August 03, 2021 | ||
36 | 36
4
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Create Case Association ~Util - Set/Clear Flags ~Util - Terminate Civil Case
Tue 08/03 2:45 PM
ORDER GRANTING Joint Stipulation to Consolidate Related Actions and Setting Schedule by Judge Josephine L. Staton that The following Related Actions are consolidated for all purposes (the" Consolidated Action") under the first-filed Wong Action, Case No. 2:19-cv-10537-JLS-KES: Munoz, et al. v. American Honda Motor Co. 2:21-cv-04030-JLS-KES. Every pleading filed in the Consolidated Action shall bear the following caption. American Honda Motor Co., Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint in the Wong Action is DEEMED WITHDRAWN WITHOUT PREJUDICE and the hearing scheduled for 8/13/2021, at 10:00 AM., is VACATED. The Rule 26(f) Scheduling Conference currently set for 9/3/2021 at 10:30 AM., in the Wong Action is VACATED. No later than thirty (30) days after the date of this order, Plaintiffs shall file a consolidated complaint. (See document for further information).The Munoz action, Case No. 2:21-cv-04030-JLS-KES, is ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (jp) |
|
Thursday, July 22, 2021 | ||
35 | 35 Text Only ORDER GRANTING Second Application of Non-Resident Attorney Daniel O. Herrera to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Frank Costobile, Rachel Fairchild, Carolyn Heier, Ben Hu, Amado Munoz, Matthew Robinson, Michael Schwartz, Gary Tetrault, James Tillery, Lingya34 pursuant to the Courts directive. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (mku) TEXT ONLY ENTRY | |
34 | 34
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64)
Thu 07/22 11:26 AM
Second APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Daniel O. Herrera to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Frank Costobile, Rachel Fairchild, Carolyn Heier, Ben Hu, Amado Munoz, Matthew Robinson, Michael Schwartz, Gary Tetrault, James Tillery, Lingyan Yin (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Previously Paid on 7/21/2021, Receipt No. 31664892) filed by Daniel O. Herrera Frank Costobile, Rachel Fairchild, Carolyn Heier, Ben Hu, Amado Munoz, Matthew Robinson, Michael Schwartz, Gary Tetrault, James Tillery, Lingyan Yin. (Straus, Alex) |
|
33 | 33
order
Response By Court to Notice of Deficiencies (G-112B) - optional html form
Thu 07/22 9:19 AM
RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Daniel O. Herrera to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Frank Costobile, Rachel Fairchild, Carolyn Heier, Ben Hu, Amado Munoz, Matthew Robinson, Michael Schwartz, Gary Tetrault, James Tillery, Lingyan Yin31 by Courtroom Deputy Clerk to Judge Josephine L. Staton. (1) The document is stricken and counsel is ordered to file an amended or corrected document by 8/5/2021. (2) Counsel shall carefully consult the error(s) noted in the Notice of Deficiency and re-file the complete application no later than 8/5/2021. (jp) |
|
textonly
Generic Text Only Entry
Thu 07/22 11:47 AM
Text Only ORDER GRANTING Second Application of Non-Resident Attorney Daniel O. Herrera to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Frank Costobile, Rachel Fairchild, Carolyn Heier, Ben Hu, Amado Munoz, Matthew Robinson, Michael Schwartz, Gary Tetrault, James Tillery, Lingya34 pursuant to the Courts directive. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (mku) |
||
Wednesday, July 21, 2021 | ||
32 | 32
notice
Notice of Deficiency in Electronically filed Pro Hac Vice Application (G-112C) - optional html form
Wed 07/21 4:27 PM
NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Daniel O. Herrera to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Frank Costobile, Rachel Fairchild, Carolyn Heier, Ben Hu, Amado Munoz, Matthew Robinson, Michael Schwartz, Gary Tetrault, James Tillery, Lingyan Yin31 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 5-4.3.4 Application not hand-signed. Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(a) Application not complete: state and/or federal courts to which the applicant has been admitted are not listed. Case information is incorrect. DJ and MJ initials are incorrect. (lt) |
|
31 | 31
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64)
Wed 07/21 8:27 AM
[DOCUMENT STRICKEN PER ORDER DATED ON 7/22/2021, SEE DOCKET ENTRY NO.33 ] - APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Daniel O. Herrera to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Frank Costobile, Rachel Fairchild, Carolyn Heier, Ben Hu, Amado Munoz, Matthew Robinson, Michael Schwartz, Gary Tetrault, James Tillery, Lingyan Yin (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-31664892) filed by plaintiff Frank Costobile, Rachel Fairchild, Carolyn Heier, Ben Hu, Amado Munoz, Matthew Robinson, Michael Schwartz, Gary Tetrault, James Tillery, Lingyan Yin. (Straus, Alex). Modified on 7/22/2021 (jp). |
|
Monday, July 12, 2021 | ||
30 | 30
order
Extending Answer Due Deadline
Tue 07/13 10:07 AM
ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO EXTEND AMERICAN HONDA MOTOR CO., INC. AND HONDA NORTH AMERICA, INC.'S RESPONSE DATE (DOC.29 by Judge Josephine L. Staton. It is hereby ordered that Honda's response to the Complaint is continued to August 9, 2021. (lom) (Entered: 07/13/2021) |
|
Tuesday, July 06, 2021 | ||
29 | 29
stip
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Tue 07/06 3:36 PM
STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Response as to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,,1 filed by Defendants American Honda Motor Co., Inc., Honda North America, Inc..(Zarifian, Zourik) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
28 | 28
service
Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
Tue 07/06 2:55 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Matthew Robinson, Frank Costobile, Ben Hu, Carolyn Heier, Rachel Fairchild, Amado Munoz, upon Defendant American Honda Motor Co., Inc. served on 5/19/2021, answer due 6/9/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CT Corporation - Carlos Paz, Agent for Service, 818 W. 7th Street, Ste. 930, Los Angeles, CA 90017 in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons returned. (Straus, Alex) |
|
Friday, June 11, 2021 | ||
27 | 27
attorney
Notice of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information (G-06)
Fri 06/11 7:46 AM
NOTICE of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information: for attorney William A. Ladnier counsel for Plaintiffs Frank Costobile, Rachel Fairchild, Carolyn Heier, Ben Hu, Amado Munoz, Matthew Robinson, Michael Schwartz, Gary Tetrault, James Tillery, Lingyan Yin. Changing Firm Name to Milberg Coleman Bryson Phillips Grossman, PLLC. Changing E-mail to wladnier@milberg.com. Filed by Plaintiffs Frank Costobile, Rachel Fairchild, Carolyn Heier, Ben Hu, Amado Munoz, Matthew Robinson, Michael Schwartz, Gary Tetrault, James Tillery, Lingyan Yin. (Ladnier, William) |
|
26 | 26
attorney
Notice of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information (G-06)
Fri 06/11 7:43 AM
NOTICE of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information: for attorney Alex R. Straus counsel for Plaintiffs Frank Costobile, Rachel Fairchild, Carolyn Heier, Ben Hu, Amado Munoz, Matthew Robinson, Michael Schwartz, Gary Tetrault, James Tillery, Lingyan Yin. Changing Address and Firm Name to Milberg Coleman Bryson Phillips Grossman, PLLC; 280 South Beverly Drive, Penthouse, Beverly Hills, CA 90212. Changing E-mail to astraus@milberg.com. Filed by Plaintiffs Frank Costobile, Rachel Fairchild, Carolyn Heier, Ben Hu, Amado Munoz, Matthew Robinson, Michael Schwartz, Gary Tetrault, James Tillery, Lingyan Yin. (Straus, Alex) |
|
Monday, June 07, 2021 | ||
25 | 25
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Mon 06/07 2:19 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants American Honda Motor Co., Inc., Honda North America, Inc., identifying American Honda Motor Co., Inc. and Honda North America, Inc. are wholly-owned subsidiaries of Honda Motor Co., Ltd., a publicly-held company in Japan. (Kizirian, Eric) |
|
24 | 24
stip
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Mon 06/07 12:20 PM
STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Response as to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,,1 filed by Defendants American Honda Motor Co., Inc., Honda North America, Inc..(Attorney Eric Y. Kizirian added to party American Honda Motor Co., Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Eric Y. Kizirian added to party Honda North America, Inc.(pty:dft))(Kizirian, Eric) |
|
Tuesday, May 25, 2021 | ||
23 | 23
order
Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only
Tue 05/25 11:41 PM
INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOSEPHINE L. STATON (mku) |
|
Monday, May 24, 2021 | ||
textonly
Generic Text Only Entry
Mon 05/24 8:31 PM
Text Only ORDER GRANTING Application of Non-Resident Attorney Shanon J. Carson to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Frank Costobile, Rachel Fairchild, Carolyn Heier, Ben Hu, Amado Munoz, Matthew Robinson, Michael Schwartz, Gary Tetrault, James Tillery, Lingyan Yi21 17 and Application of Non-Resident Attorney Glen L. Abramson to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Frank Costobile, Rachel Fairchild, Carolyn Heier, Ben Hu, Amado Munoz, Matthew Robinson, Michael Schwartz, Gary Tetrault, James Tillery, Lingyan Yin16 pursuant to the Courts directive. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (mku) |
||
Friday, May 21, 2021 | ||
21 | 21
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64)
Fri 05/21 12:23 PM
Corrected APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Shanon J. Carson to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Frank Costobile, Rachel Fairchild, Carolyn Heier, Ben Hu, Amado Munoz, Matthew Robinson, Michael Schwartz, Gary Tetrault, James Tillery, Lingyan Yin (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Previously Paid on 5/19/2021, Receipt No. ACACDC-31323635) filed by Plaintiffs Frank Costobile, Rachel Fairchild, Carolyn Heier, Ben Hu, Amado Munoz, Matthew Robinson, Michael Schwartz, Gary Tetrault, James Tillery, Lingyan Yin. (Straus, Alex) |
|
Thursday, May 20, 2021 | ||
20 | 20
notice
Notice of Deficiency in Electronically filed Pro Hac Vice Application (G-112C) - optional html form
Thu 05/20 2:52 PM
NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Shanon J. Carson to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Frank Costobile, Rachel Fairchild, Carolyn Heier, Ben Hu, Amado Munoz, Matthew Robinson, Michael Schwartz, Gary Tetrault, James Tillery, Lingyan Yin (17 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 5-4.3.4 Application not signed. (lt) |
|
19 | 19
order
Transferring Case purs GO 21-01 (Related Case)(CV-34)
Thu 05/20 2:51 PM
ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 21-01-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 8:19-cv-00818 JLS(KESx). Case transferred from Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian and Judge Virginia A. Phillips to Judge Josephine L. Staton and Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:21-cv-04030 JLS(KESx). Signed by Judge Josephine L. Staton (rn) |
|
18 | 18
notice
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123)
Thu 05/20 9:24 AM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Lisa A. White counsel for Plaintiffs Frank Costobile, Rachel Fairchild, Carolyn Heier, Ben Hu, Amado Munoz, Matthew Robinson, Michael Schwartz, Gary Tetrault, James Tillery, Lingyan Yin. Lisa A. White is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiffs Amado Munoz, Carolyn Heier, Ben Hu, Gary Tetrault, Matthew Robinson, Michael Schwartz, Frank Costobile, Rachel Fairchild, James Tillery and Lingyan Yin. (Attorney Lisa A. White added to party Frank Costobile(pty:pla), Attorney Lisa A. White added to party Rachel Fairchild(pty:pla), Attorney Lisa A. White added to party Carolyn Heier(pty:pla), Attorney Lisa A. White added to party Ben Hu(pty:pla), Attorney Lisa A. White added to party Amado Munoz(pty:pla), Attorney Lisa A. White added to party Matthew Robinson(pty:pla), Attorney Lisa A. White added to party Michael Schwartz(pty:pla), Attorney Lisa A. White added to party Gary Tetrault(pty:pla), Attorney Lisa A. White added to party James Tillery(pty:pla), Attorney Lisa A. White added to party Lingyan Yin(pty:pla))(White, Lisa) |
|
Wednesday, May 19, 2021 | ||
17 | 17
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64)
Wed 05/19 2:37 PM
APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Shanon J. Carson to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Frank Costobile, Rachel Fairchild, Carolyn Heier, Ben Hu, Amado Munoz, Matthew Robinson, Michael Schwartz, Gary Tetrault, James Tillery, Lingyan Yin (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-31323635) filed by Plaintiffs Frank Costobile, Rachel Fairchild, Carolyn Heier, Ben Hu, Amado Munoz, Matthew Robinson, Michael Schwartz, Gary Tetrault, James Tillery, Lingyan Yin. (Straus, Alex) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 2 Certificate of Good Standing | ||
16 | 16
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64)
Wed 05/19 2:33 PM
APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Glen L. Abramson to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Frank Costobile, Rachel Fairchild, Carolyn Heier, Ben Hu, Amado Munoz, Matthew Robinson, Michael Schwartz, Gary Tetrault, James Tillery, Lingyan Yin (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-31323408) filed by Plaintiffs Frank Costobile, Rachel Fairchild, Carolyn Heier, Ben Hu, Amado Munoz, Matthew Robinson, Michael Schwartz, Gary Tetrault, James Tillery, Lingyan Yin. (Straus, Alex) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 2 Certificate of Good Standing | ||
Tuesday, May 18, 2021 | ||
15 | 15
order
Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only
Tue 05/18 5:39 PM
STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Virginia A. Phillips. (cch) |
|
Monday, May 17, 2021 | ||
14 | 14
notice
Appearance
Mon 05/17 6:27 AM
NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney William A. Ladnier on behalf of Plaintiffs Frank Costobile, Rachel Fairchild, Carolyn Heier, Ben Hu, Amado Munoz, Matthew Robinson, Michael Schwartz, Gary Tetrault, James Tillery, Lingyan Yin (Attorney William A. Ladnier added to party Frank Costobile(pty:pla), Attorney William A. Ladnier added to party Rachel Fairchild(pty:pla), Attorney William A. Ladnier added to party Carolyn Heier(pty:pla), Attorney William A. Ladnier added to party Ben Hu(pty:pla), Attorney William A. Ladnier added to party Amado Munoz(pty:pla), Attorney William A. Ladnier added to party Matthew Robinson(pty:pla), Attorney William A. Ladnier added to party Michael Schwartz(pty:pla), Attorney William A. Ladnier added to party Gary Tetrault(pty:pla), Attorney William A. Ladnier added to party James Tillery(pty:pla), Attorney William A. Ladnier added to party Lingyan Yin(pty:pla))(Ladnier, William) |
|
Friday, May 14, 2021 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Related Case(s)
Fri 05/14 2:13 PM
NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Plaintiffs Frank Costobile, Rachel Fairchild, Carolyn Heier, Ben Hu, Amado Munoz, Matthew Robinson, Michael Schwartz, Gary Tetrault, James Tillery, Lingyan Yin. Related Case(s): 8:19-cv-00818-JLS-KES (Straus, Alex) |
|
Thursday, May 13, 2021 | ||
12 | 12
attorney
Pro Hac Vice Application Due (G-109) - optional html form
Thu 05/13 4:36 PM
NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Glen L. Abramson. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (lh) |
|
11 | 11
attorney
Pro Hac Vice Application Due (G-109) - optional html form
Thu 05/13 4:34 PM
NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Shanon J. Carson. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (lh) |
|
10 | 10
attorney
Pro Hac Vice Application Due (G-109) - optional html form
Thu 05/13 4:33 PM
NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Bryan L. Clobes. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (lh) |
|
9 | 9
attorney
Pro Hac Vice Application Due (G-109) - optional html form
Thu 05/13 4:32 PM
NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Daniel O. Herrera. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (lh) |
|
8 | 8
attorney
Pro Hac Vice Application Due (G-109) - optional html form
Thu 05/13 4:30 PM
NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Lisa A. White. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (lh) |
|
7 | 7
service
Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Thu 05/13 4:27 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 as to Defendants American Honda Motor Co., Inc., Honda North America, Inc. (lh) |
|
6 | 6
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Thu 05/13 4:21 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Thu 05/13 4:21 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Virginia A. Phillips and Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. (lh) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Thu 05/13 2:31 PM
Certificate and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs All Plaintiffs, identifying Plaintiffs and Defendants. (Straus, Alex) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Summons Request
Thu 05/13 2:27 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,,1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)2 filed by Plaintiffs Frank Costobile, Rachel Fairchild, Carolyn Heier, Ben Hu, Amado Munoz, Matthew Robinson, Michael Schwartz, Matthew Tetrault, James Tillery, Lingyan Yin. (Straus, Alex) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Thu 05/13 2:25 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Frank Costobile, Rachel Fairchild, Carolyn Heier, Ben Hu, Amado Munoz, Matthew Robinson, Michael Schwartz, Matthew Tetrault, James Tillery, Lingyan Yin. (Straus, Alex) |
|
1 | 1
115
pgs
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Thu 05/13 2:23 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-31290695 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiffs Michael Schwartz, Ben Hu, Frank Costobile, James Tillery, Carolyn Heier, Rachel Fairchild, Amado Munoz, Matthew Tetrault, Lingyan Yin, Matthew Robinson. (Attorney Alex R. Straus added to party Frank Costobile(pty:pla), Attorney Alex R. Straus added to party Rachel Fairchild(pty:pla), Attorney Alex R. Straus added to party Carolyn Heier(pty:pla), Attorney Alex R. Straus added to party Ben Hu(pty:pla), Attorney Alex R. Straus added to party Amado Munoz(pty:pla), Attorney Alex R. Straus added to party Matthew Robinson(pty:pla), Attorney Alex R. Straus added to party Michael Schwartz(pty:pla), Attorney Alex R. Straus added to party Matthew Tetrault(pty:pla), Attorney Alex R. Straus added to party James Tillery(pty:pla), Attorney Alex R. Straus added to party Lingyan Yin(pty:pla))(Straus, Alex) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit EX. A - Honda message to authorized dealers re 2016-2020 Honda Civic Compressor Replacement, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit EX B - Exemplar of Warranty Booklet, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Ex. C - November 2019 Letter to Honda owners, | ||
Att: 4 Declaration Declaration of Alex R. Straus Pursuant to California Legal Remedies Act Section 1780(d) |