West et al v. Amazon.com Inc
Washington Western District Court | |
Judge: | Ricardo S Martinez |
Case #: | 2:21-cv-00694 |
Nature of Suit | 410 Other Statutes - Antitrust |
Cause | 15:1 Antitrust Litigation |
Case Filed: | May 26, 2021 |
Terminated: | Jun 21, 2021 |
Last checked: Monday Nov 22, 2021 12:37 AM PST |
Defendant
Amazon.com Inc
|
|
Plaintiff
Robert Taylor
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kenneth David West
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 1 hours ago |
Friday, June 25, 2021 | ||
13 | 13
order
Order on Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Fri 06/25 2:33 PM
ORDER re3 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Zina Bash for plaintiffs Robert Taylor and Kenneth David West, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only. NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d). (CDA) |
|
Monday, June 21, 2021 | ||
12 | 12
order
Consolidation Order - for Member cases only
Mon 06/21 3:49 PM
ORDER re the parties'11 Stipulated MOTION for Consolidation, Filing of Consolidated Amended Complaint, and Schedule for Answer or Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiffs shall file a consolidated amended class action complaint within 30 days of entry of this order. Amazon shall file an answer or otherwise respond within 60 days after Plaintiffs file their consolidated amended class action complaint. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. This case is consolidated into 21-cv-693-RSM and administratively closed. All future filings shall be in 21-cv-693-RSM. (PM) |
|
Friday, June 18, 2021 | ||
11 | 11
motion
Stipulated Motion
Fri 06/18 4:02 PM
Stipulated MOTION and [Proposed] Order for Consolidation, Filing of Consolidated Amended Complaint, and Schedule for Answer or Motion to Dismiss , filed by Plaintiffs Robert Taylor, Kenneth David West. Noting Date 6/18/2021, (Berman, Steve) |
|
Thursday, June 17, 2021 | ||
10 | 10
order
Order on Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Thu 06/17 10:44 AM
ORDER re5 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Warren D Postman for Plaintiffs Robert Taylor and Kenneth David West, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only. NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d). (DS) |
|
Thursday, June 10, 2021 | ||
9 | 9
service
Waiver of Service
Thu 06/10 11:33 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant Amazon.com Inc mailed on 5/27/2021 (Berman, Steve) |
|
Tuesday, June 01, 2021 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Pendency of Other Action
Tue 06/01 12:59 PM
NOTICE of Pendency of Other Action in Superior Court of the District of Columbia, case number(s) in other court 2021 CA 001775 B ; filed by Plaintiffs Robert Taylor, Kenneth David West.(Berman, Steve) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Friday, May 28, 2021 | ||
7 | 7
service
Summons Issued
Fri 05/28 2:10 PM
Summons Electronically Issued as to defendant Amazon.com Inc. (RE) |
|
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Fri 05/28 2:06 PM
Judge Ricardo S. Martinez added. (RE) |
||
Thursday, May 27, 2021 | ||
6 | 6
order
Order on Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Thu 05/27 12:54 PM
ORDER re4 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Albert Young Pak for Plaintiffs Robert Taylor and Kenneth David West, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only. NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d). (DS) |
|
5 | 5
misc
Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Thu 05/27 10:05 AM
APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Warren D. Postman FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiffs Robert Taylor, Kenneth David West (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7101219 (Berman, Steve) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Thu 05/27 10:03 AM
APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Albert Y. Pak FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiffs Robert Taylor, Kenneth David West (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7101213 (Berman, Steve) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Thu 05/27 10:00 AM
APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Zina Bash FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiffs Robert Taylor, Kenneth David West (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7101207 (Berman, Steve) |
|
Wednesday, May 26, 2021 | ||
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Related Case
Wed 05/26 6:41 PM
NOTICE of Related Case(s) 2:20-cv-00424-RAJ, by Plaintiffs Robert Taylor, Kenneth David West. (Berman, Steve) |
|
1 | 1
43
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Wed 05/26 6:36 PM
COMPLAINT Class Action Complaint against defendant(s) Amazon.com, Inc. with JURY DEMAND Attorney Steve W. Berman added to party Robert Taylor(pty:pla), Attorney Steve W. Berman added to party Kenneth David West(pty:pla), filed by Kenneth David West, Robert Taylor.(Berman, Steve) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summons |