NETCHOICE LLC et al v. MOODY et al
Florida Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Robert L Hinkle |
Referred: | Martin A Fitzpatrick |
Case #: | 4:21-cv-00220 |
Nature of Suit | 950 Other Statutes - Constitutionality of State Statutes |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | May 27, 2021 |
Case in other court: | USSC, 22-00277 |
Last checked: Tuesday Nov 23, 2021 3:29 AM EST |
Amicus
ELECTRONIC FRONTIER FOUNDATION
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
WASHINGTON CENTER FOR TECHNOLOGY POLICY INCLUSION
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
TECHNET
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
TECHFREEDOM
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
REPORTERS COMMITTEE FOR FREEDOM OF THE PRESS
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
PROGRESSIVE POLICY INSTITUTE
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
PEN AMERICAN CENTER INC
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
NATIONAL BLACK JUSTICE COALITION
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
MEDIA LAW RESOURCE CENTER INC
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
INTERNET ASSOCIATION
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
INFORMATION TECHNOLOGY & INNOVATION FOUNDATION
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
LEONID GOLDSTEIN
|
|
Amicus
ENGINE ADVOCACY
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
CONSUMER TECHNOLOGY ASSOCIATION
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
CHAMBER OF PROGRESS
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
CENTER FOR DEMOCRACY AND TECHNOLOGY
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
AUTHORS GUILD INC
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION OF FLORIDA
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
CONNECTED COMMERCE COUNCIL
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
JONI ALEXIS POITIER
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
JASON TODD ALLEN
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
PATRICK GILLESPIE
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
JOHN MARTIN HAYES
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
ASHLEY BROOKE MOODY
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
KYMBERLEE CURRY SMITH
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Protect Democracy Project, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
ELECTRONIC FRONTIER FOUNDATION
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
NETCHOICE LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
COMPUTER & COMMUNICATIONS INDUSTRY ASSOCIATION
|
Represented By
|
GPO
Jun 30 2021
ORDER granting 22 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 6/30/2021. (RH) |
Docket last updated: 04/22/2024 6:03 AM EDT |
Wednesday, February 14, 2024 | ||
Set Deadlines re115 Notice of Appeal, :( Clerk to check status of Appeal on 5/13/2024 .) (sjb) |