Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Craig T Goldblatt
Case #: 1:21-bk-10883
Case Filed:May 31, 2021

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors200-999
Est. Assets$10,000,001 to $50 million
Est. Liabilities $100,000,001 to $500 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Avadim Health, Inc.
81 Thompson St
Asheville, NC 28803-2329
Represented By
Laura Davis Jones
Pachulski Stang Ziehl & Jones LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee J. Caleb Boggs Federal Building 844 King Street, Suite 2207 Lockbox 35
Wilmington, DE 19801

Docket last updated: 11 minutes ago
Monday, July 26, 2021
211 211 misc Affidavit/Declaration of Service Mon 07/26 5:12 PM
Affidavit/Declaration of Service re: Supplemental Notice of Potential Assumption and Assignment of Certain Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases and Proposed Cure Amounts [Docket No. 194] . Filed by Omni Agent Solutions, Inc.. Related [+] (Lowry, Randy)
Related: [-] 194
210 210 notice Assumption of Lease/Executory Contract - Notice Mon 07/26 2:30 PM
Notice of Assumption of Lease/Executory Contract Second Supplemental Notice of Potential Assumption and Assignment of Certain Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases and Proposed Cure Amounts Related [+]. Filed by Avadim Health, Inc.. (Jones, Laura Davis)
Related: [-] 16 ,115 ,149 ,194
209 209 57 pgs order Order Mon 07/26 12:45 PM
Final Order (I) Authorizing the Debtors to Obtain Postpetition Senior Secured Financing and (B) Use Cash Collateral, (II) Granting Adequate Protection to Prepetition Secured Parties, (III) Granting Liens and Superpriority Claims, (IV) Modifying the Automatic Stay, and (V) Granting Related Relief Related [+] Order Signed on 7/26/2021. (NAB)
Related: [-] 15 ,51 ,61
Friday, July 23, 2021
208 208 4 pgs misc Certification of Counsel(Aty) Fri 07/23 7:57 PM
Certification of Counsel Regarding Debtors' Motion for Entry of Interim Order and Final Hearing Regarding Debtors Motion Seeking Entry of Interim and Final Orders (I) Authorizing the Debtors to Obtain Postpetition Secured Financing Pursuant to Section 364 of the Bankruptcy Code; (II) Authorizing the Debtors to Use Cash Collateral; (III) Granting Liens and Superpriority Administrative Expense Claims; (IV) Granting Adequate Protection to the Prepetition Lenders; (V) Modifying the Automatic Stay; (VI) Scheduling a Final Hearing, and (VII) Granting Related Relief Related [+] Filed by Avadim Health, Inc.. (Jones, Laura Davis)
Related: [-] 15 ,51 ,61
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order
Att: 2 63 pgs Exhibit B - Blackline Order
Thursday, July 22, 2021
207 207 11 pgs notice Bar Date - Notice Thu 07/22 6:12 PM
Notice of Bar Date Notice of Deadlines for the Filing of (I) Proofs of Claim, Including Requests For Payment Pursuant to Section 503(B)(9) of the Bankruptcy Code, (II) Administrative Claims, And (III) Rejection Damages Claims . Filed by Avadim Health, Inc.. Proofs of Claims due by 8/31/2021. (Jones, Laura Davis)
Related: [-]
206 206 misc Affidavit/Declaration of Service Thu 07/22 4:50 PM
Affidavit/Declaration of Service re: First Monthly Staffing Report by Carl Marks Advisory Group LLC for Compensation Earned and Expense Incurred for the Period of June 1, 2021, through June 30, 2021 [Docket No. 203] . Filed by Omni Agent Solutions, Inc.. Related [+] (Lowry, Randy)
Related: [-] 203
205 205 misc Affidavit/Declaration of Service Thu 07/22 4:49 PM
Affidavit/Declaration of Service re: Notice of Agenda for Hearing Scheduled for July 23, 2021 at 1:00 P.M. (Prevailing Eastern Time), Before the Honorable Craig T. Goldblatt Bankruptcy Judge, at the United States Bankruptcy Court for the District of Delaware, Located at 824 North Market Street, 3rd Floor, Courtroom No. 7, Wilmington, Delaware 19801 [Docket No. 201] . Filed by Omni Agent Solutions, Inc.. Related [+] (Lowry, Randy)
Related: [-] 201
204 204 misc Affidavit/Declaration of Service Thu 07/22 4:47 PM
Affidavit/Declaration of Service (Supplemental Service) re: Notice of Chapter 11 Bankruptcy Case Official Form 309F1 [Docket No. 104] . Filed by Omni Agent Solutions, Inc.. Related [+] (Lowry, Randy)
Related: [-] 104
Wednesday, July 21, 2021
203 203 misc Staffing Report - Monthly Wed 07/21 11:01 PM
Monthly Staffing Report for Filing Period June 1, 2021 through June 30, 2021 /First Monthly Staffing Report By Carl Marks Advisory Group LLC for Compensation Earned and Expenses Incurred for the Period of June 1, 2021 Through June 30, 2021 Filed by Carl Marks Advisory Group LLC. Objections due by 8/4/2021. (Jones, Laura Davis)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice
Att: 2 Exhibit A
Att: 3 Exhibit B
202 202 misc Affidavit/Declaration of Service Wed 07/21 5:29 PM
Affidavit/Declaration of Service re: Notice of Filing Amendments to Schedules of Assets and Liabilities of Avadim Health, Inc. [Docket No. 192] and Notice of Filing Amendments to Schedules of Assets and Liabilities of Relion Manufacturing, Inc. [Docket No. 193] . Filed by Omni Agent Solutions, Inc.. Related [+] (Lowry, Randy)
Related: [-] 192 ,193
201 201 5 pgs notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (HEARING CANCELLED) - Notice Wed 07/21 5:04 PM
HEARING CANCELLED. Notice of Agenda of Matters not going forward. The following hearing has been cancelled. Filed by Avadim Health, Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 7/23/2021 at 01:00 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 3rd Fl., Courtroom #7, Wilmington, Delaware. (Jones, Laura Davis)
Related: [-]
200 200 order Approve Wed 07/21 2:45 PM
Order Approving Creditor Information Protocols Under Section 1102 of the Bankruptcy Code. Related [+] Order Signed on 7/21/2021. (NAB)
Related: [-] ument(s)112
199 199 12 pgs order Set Last Day To File Proofs of Claim Wed 07/21 2:37 PM
Order (I) Setting Bar Dates for Filing Proofs of Claim, Including Requests for Payment Under Section 503(b)(9), (II) Setting a Bar Date for the Filing of Proofs of Claim by Governmental Units, (III) Setting a Bar Date for the Filing of Requests for Allowance of Administrative Expense Claims, (IV) Establishing Amended Schedules Bar Date and Rejection Damages Bar Date, (V) Approving the Form of and Manner for Filing Proofs of Claim, (VI) Approving Notice of Bar Dates, and (VII) Granting Related Relief Related [+]. Signed on 7/21/2021. (NAB)
Related: [-] 196
198 198 notice Appearance - Notice Wed 07/21 11:08 AM
Notice of Appearance. Filed by Proklean Services LLC. (Fink, Scott)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 20, 2021
197 197 misc Certificate of No Objection Tue 07/20 4:41 PM
Certificate of No Objection Regarding Motion for Entry of an Order Establishing Protocol for (A) the Dissemination of Information by the Committee and (B) Protecting Confidential and Privileged Information Pursuant to Sections 105(a), 107(b) and 1102(b)(3)(A) of the Bankruptcy Code Related [+] Filed by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (Niederman, Seth)
Related: [-] 112
196 196 3 pgs misc Certificate of No Objection Tue 07/20 4:16 PM
Certificate of No Objection re Debtors Motion for Entry of an Order (I) Setting Bar Dates for Filing Proofs of Claim, Including Requests for Payment Under Section 503(b)(9), (II) Setting a Bar Date for the Filing of Proofs of Claim by Governmental Units, (III) Setting a Bar Date for the Filing of Requests for Allowance of Administrative Expense Claims, (IV) Establishing Amended Schedules Bar Date and Rejection Damages Bar Date, (V) Approving the Form of and Manner for Filing Proofs of Claim, (VI) Approving Notice of Bar Dates, and (VII) Granting Related Relief Related [+] Filed by Avadim Health, Inc.. (Cairns, Timothy)
Related: [-] 179
Att: 1 13 pgs Exhibit A - Proposed Order
195 195 crditcrd none Tue 07/20 4:09 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Amended Schedules/Statements([LINK 21-10883 CTG] ) [misc,amdsch] ( 32.00). Receipt Number A10409502, amount $ 32.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 19, 2021
194 194 notice Assumption of Lease/Executory Contract - Notice Mon 07/19 12:59 PM
Notice of Assumption of Lease/Executory Contract Supplemental Notice of Potential Assumption and Assignment of Certain Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases and Proposed Cure Amounts Related [+]. Filed by Avadim Health, Inc.. (Jones, Laura Davis)
Related: [-] 16 ,115 ,149