BP Liquidation Corp.
Member Case
Lead case is: 1:21-bk-10883
Lead case is: 1:21-bk-10883
Delaware Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Craig T Goldblatt |
Case #: | 1:21-bk-10885 |
Case Filed: | May 31, 2021 |
Terminated: | Oct 11, 2022 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1-49 |
Est. Assets | $100,001 to $500,000 |
Est. Liabilities | $100,000,001 to $500 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Bionome Properties Corp.
81 Thompson St
Asheville, NC 28803-2329 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee J. Caleb Boggs Federal Building 844 King Street, Suite 2207 Lockbox 35
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
Docket last updated: 37 minutes ago |
Tuesday, October 11, 2022 | ||
7 | 7
order
Final Decree
Tue 10/11 1:14 PM
Order Granting Liquidating Trust's Motion for Entry of an Order (I) Entering a Final Decree Closing the Dismissed Debtors' Cases, and (II) Granting Such Other Related Relief. Signed on 10/11/2022 (NAB) |
|
court
Close Bankruptcy Case
Tue 10/11 4:51 PM
Bankruptcy Case Closed (NR) |
||
Friday, August 27, 2021 | ||
6 | 6
3
pgs
order
Order
Fri 08/27 12:10 PM
Order Approving Change of Case Caption. An order has been entered in this case directing that the caption of this case be changed to conform with the name change of Bionome Properties, Corp. to BP Liquidation Corp. Order Signed on 8/26/2021. (FMo) |
|
Monday, June 28, 2021 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Schedules/Statements
Tue 06/29 12:00 AM
Schedules/Statements filed: , Stmt of Financial Affairs,. of Bionome Properties Corp. Filed by Bionome Properties Corp.. (Cairns, Timothy) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Schedules/Statements
Mon 06/28 11:58 PM
Schedules/Statements filed: Sch A-B, Sch D, Sch E-F, Sch G, Sch H, , Sum of Assets and Liabilities, Decl Concerning Debtors Schs,. of Bionome Properties Corp. Filed by Bionome Properties Corp.. (Cairns, Timothy) |
|
Wednesday, June 02, 2021 | ||
3 | 3
order
Order-Joint Admin
Wed 06/02 1:42 PM
Order Authorizing Joint Administration of Related Chapter 11 cases for Procedural Purposes only. An order (the Joint Administration Order) has been entered in this case directing the joint administration of the chapter 11 cases listed below for procedural purposes only. The docket in Case No 21-10883 (CTG) should be consulted for all matters affecting this case. The following chapter 11 cases are jointly administered pursuant to the Joint Administration Order: Avadim Health, Inc. 21-10883 (CTG); Avadim Health IP, Inc. 21-10884 (CTG); Bionome Properties Corp. 21-10885 (CTG); Quality Assurance Associates, Inc. 21-10886 (CTG); and Relion Manufacturing, Inc 21-10887 (CTG). Order Signed on 6/2/2021. (NAB) |
|
Tuesday, June 01, 2021 | ||
2 | 2
crditcrd
none
Tue 06/01 10:15 AM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK 21-10885 ) [misc,volp11a] (1738.00). Receipt Number A10352555, amount $1738.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
court
Case Assigned
Tue 06/01 7:41 AM
Judge Craig T Goldblatt added to case (LB) |
||
Monday, May 31, 2021 | ||
1 | 1
18
pgs
misc
RETIRED - Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)
Mon 05/31 9:58 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition of Bionome Properties Corp. . Fee Amount $1738. Filed by Bionome Properties Corp.. (Jones, Laura Davis) |
|
Att: 1 Creditor Matrix |