Tennessee Western District Court
Judge:S Thomas Anderson
Referred: Jon A York
Case #: 1:21-cv-01085
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question
Case Filed:Jun 02, 2021
Terminated:Sep 15, 2022
Last checked: Monday Nov 29, 2021 3:27 AM CST
Amicus
Association of American Indian Farmers
68 Wind Road
Baskerville, VA 23915
Represented By
Randolph Chen
Public Justice
contact info
David Samuel Muraskin
Public Justice
contact info
Amicus
National Black Farmers Association
68 Wind Road
Baskerville, VA 23915
Represented By
Randolph Chen
Public Justice
contact info
David Samuel Muraskin
Public Justice
contact info
Defendant
Zach Ducheneaux
in his official capacity as Administrator of the Farm Service Agency 1400 Independence Ave., SW
Washington, DC 20250
Represented By
Audrey M. Calkins
U.S. Attorney'S Office
contact info
Kyla Snow
Doj-Civ
contact info
Emily Sue Newton
Doj-Civ
contact info
Defendant
Thomas J Vilsack
in his official capacity as Secretary of the United States Department of Agriculture 1400 Independence Ave. SW
Washington, DC 20250
Represented By
Audrey M. Calkins
U.S. Attorney'S Office
contact info
Kyla Snow
Doj-Civ
contact info
Emily Sue Newton
Doj-Civ
contact info
Plaintiff
Robert Holman
Represented By
Celia Howard O'Leary
Southeastern Legal Foundation
contact info
William Edward Trachman
Mountain States Legal Foundation
contact info
Corey Christopher Bartkus
Campbell Litigation, P.C.
contact info
Braden H. Boucek
Southeastern Legal Foundation
contact info

GPO Jul 08 2021
ORDER GRANTING 7 MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. Signed by Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson on 7/8/2021. (mbm)
GPO Aug 02 2021
ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS' 45 MOTION TO STAY PROCEEDINGS PENDING RESOLUTION OF RELATED CLASS ACTION. Signed by Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson on 8/2/2021. (mbm)
GPO Jan 26 2022
ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' 57 MOTION FOR PARTIAL DISMISSAL. Signed by Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson on 1/26/22. (mbm)

Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Thursday, September 29, 2022
86 86 misc Bill of Costs Thu 09/29 12:56 PM
BILL OF COSTS (PROPOSED) by Robert Holman. (Boucek, Braden)
Related: [-]
85 85 motion Attorney Fees Thu 09/29 12:52 PM
MOTION for Attorney Fees (proposed order submitted) by Robert Holman.(Boucek, Braden)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum Memorandum in Support of Motion for Attorney Fees and Coasts,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 in support of attorney fees,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit 2 in support of costs