CLYDE et al v. WALKER et al
District Of Columbia District Court | |
Judge: | Timothy J Kelly |
Case #: | 1:21-cv-01605 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Jun 13, 2021 |
Terminated: | Aug 01, 2022 |
Last checked: Saturday Dec 11, 2021 3:28 AM EST |
Defendant
CATHERINE SZPINDOR
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
WILLIAM J. WALKER
In his Official Capacity as Sergeant at Arms of the U.S. House of Representatives H-124 U.S. Capitol First St., SE
Washington, DC 20004 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
ANDREW S. CLYDE
Individually, and in his Official Capacity as a member of the U.S. House of Representatives
521 Cannon House Office Bldg, DC 20515 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
LOUIE GOHMERT
Individually, and in his Official Capacity as a member of the U.S. House of Representatives 2239 Rayburn House Office Bldg.
Washington, DC 20515 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
LLOYD SMUCKER
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/24/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, December 12, 2023 | ||
27 | 27
appeal
USCA Mandate
Wed 12/13 8:07 AM
MANDATE of USCA as to24 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court, filed by LOUIE GOHMERT, ANDREW S. CLYDE, LLOYD SMUCKER ; USCA Case Number 22-5263 (znmw) |
|
Att: 1 USCA Judgment 10/20/2023 | ||
Tuesday, January 03, 2023 | ||
26 | 26
notice
Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance
Tue 01/03 9:41 PM
NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to CATHERINE SZPINDOR, WILLIAM J. WALKER. Attorney Douglas N. Letter terminated. (Letter, Douglas) |
|
Friday, September 30, 2022 | ||
25 | 25
appeal
Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA
Fri 09/30 12:46 PM
Transmission of the Notice of Appeal, Order Appealed (Memorandum Opinion), and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals. The Court of Appeals fee was paid re24 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court. (ztth) |
|
24 | 24
appeal
Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit
Fri 09/30 12:33 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL TO DC CIRCUIT COURT as to22 Memorandum & Opinion,21 Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction,, Order on Motion for Hearing by ANDREW S. CLYDE, LOUIE GOHMERT, LLOYD SMUCKER. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number ADCDC-9567155. Fee Status: Fee Paid. Parties have been notified. (Mayfield, Earl) |
|
Monday, August 29, 2022 | ||
23 | 23
notice
Notice (Other)
Mon 08/29 2:52 PM
ENTERED IN ERROR.....NOTICE of Appeal by ANDREW S. CLYDE, LOUIE GOHMERT, LLOYD SMUCKER re22 Memorandum & Opinion,21 Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction,, Order on Motion for Hearing (Mayfield, Earl); Modified on 8/29/2022 (ztth) |
|
notice
Notice of QC
Mon 08/29 5:25 PM
NOTICE OF ERROR re23 Notice (Other) |
||
Monday, August 01, 2022 | ||
22 | 22
11
pgs
order
Memorandum & Opinion
Mon 08/01 5:02 PM
MEMORANDUM OPINION in support of21 Order granting Defendants'14 Motion to Dismiss and denying Plaintiffs'17 Motion for Hearing. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 08/01/2022. (lctjk2) |
|
21 | 21
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction Order on Motion for Hearing
Mon 08/01 5:00 PM
ORDER granting Defendants'14 Motion to Dismiss and denying Plaintiffs'17 Motion for Hearing. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 08/01/2022. (lctjk2) |
|
Friday, July 29, 2022 | ||
20 | 20
notice
Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance
Fri 07/29 4:50 PM
NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to CATHERINE SZPINDOR, WILLIAM J. WALKER. Attorney Stacie Marion Fahsel terminated. (Fahsel, Stacie) |
|
Monday, January 24, 2022 | ||
19 | 19
notice
Notice of Supplemental Authority
Mon 01/24 4:26 PM
NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY by CATHERINE SZPINDOR, WILLIAM J. WALKER (Letter, Douglas) |
|
Wednesday, December 08, 2021 | ||
18 | 18
respm
Response to motion
Wed 12/08 10:28 AM
RESPONSE re17 MOTION for Hearing re16 Reply to opposition to Motion,15 Memorandum in Opposition,14 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by CATHERINE SZPINDOR, WILLIAM J. WALKER. (Letter, Douglas) |
|
Tuesday, December 07, 2021 | ||
17 | 17
motion
Hearing
Tue 12/07 3:35 PM
MOTION for Hearing re16 Reply to opposition to Motion,15 Memorandum in Opposition,14 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by ANDREW S. CLYDE, LOUIE GOHMERT, LLOYD SMUCKER. (Mayfield, Earl) |
|
Friday, September 24, 2021 | ||
16 | 16
respm
Reply to opposition to motion
Fri 09/24 11:31 PM
REPLY to opposition to motion re14 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by CATHERINE SZPINDOR, WILLIAM J. WALKER. (Letter, Douglas) |
|
Friday, September 17, 2021 | ||
15 | 15
30+
pgs
respm
Memorandum in opposition to motion
Fri 09/17 11:22 PM
Memorandum in opposition to re14 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by ANDREW S. CLYDE, LOUIE GOHMERT, LLOYD SMUCKER. (Mayfield, Earl) |
|
Friday, September 03, 2021 | ||
14 | 14
motion
Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction
Fri 09/03 1:26 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by CATHERINE SZPINDOR, WILLIAM J. WALKER.(Letter, Douglas) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, August 11, 2021 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Set/Reset Deadlines
Wed 08/11 12:33 PM
MINUTE ORDER granting Defendants'13 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint. It is hereby ORDERED, for good cause shown, that the motion is GRANTED. Defendants shall respond to Plaintiffs'9 First Amended Complaint by September 3, 2021. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 8/11/2021. (lctjk1) |
||
Tuesday, August 10, 2021 | ||
13 | 13
motion
Extension of Time to
Tue 08/10 11:27 AM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint by CATHERINE SZPINDOR, WILLIAM J. WALKER. (Letter, Douglas) |
|
12 | 12
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 08/10 11:09 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Stacie Marion Fahsel on behalf of CATHERINE SZPINDOR, WILLIAM J. WALKER (Fahsel, Stacie) |
|
11 | 11
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 08/10 10:55 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Todd Barry Tatelman on behalf of CATHERINE SZPINDOR, WILLIAM J. WALKER (Tatelman, Todd) |
|
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 08/10 10:38 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas N. Letter on behalf of CATHERINE SZPINDOR, WILLIAM J. WALKER (Letter, Douglas) |
|
Thursday, July 15, 2021 | ||
9 | 9
cmp
Amended Complaint
Fri 07/23 11:14 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against CATHERINE SZPINDOR, WILLIAM J. WALKER filed by ANDREW S. CLYDE, LOUIE GOHMERT, LLOYD SMUCKER. (ztth) |
|
8 | 8
motion
Amend/Correct
Thu 07/15 4:16 PM
Consent MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint by ANDREW S. CLYDE, LOUIE GOHMERT.(Mayfield, Earl) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Amended Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Redlined Amended Complaint | ||
order
Order on Motion to Amend/Correct
Thu 07/15 5:38 PM
MINUTE ORDER granting Plaintiffs'8 Consent Motion to Amend Complaint. It is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is instructed to file ECF No. 8-1 on the docket as Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 7/15/2021. (lctjk1) |
||
Monday, June 21, 2021 | ||
7 | 7
service
Summons Returned Executed as to U.S. Attorney General Summons Returned Executed as to US Attorney
Mon 06/21 5:58 PM
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General June 21, 2021., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 6/21/2021. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 8/20/2021.)(Mayfield, Earl) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit USPS delivery status | ||
Thursday, June 17, 2021 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Set/Reset Deadlines
Thu 06/17 10:00 AM
MINUTE ORDER granting Plaintiffs'2 Motion to Use Business/Attorney Address. In light of the representations made in Plaintiffs' motion and that they are proceeding in part in their official capacities, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that Plaintiffs may use their official addresses in the caption of their complaint to comply with Local Civil Rule 11.1. Plaintiffs shall file an amended complaint doing so within 30 days. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 6/17/2021. (lctjk1) |
||
Wednesday, June 16, 2021 | ||
6 | 6
order
.Order Standing Order
Wed 06/16 9:48 AM
STANDING ORDER. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 6/16/2021. (lctjk1) |
|
Tuesday, June 15, 2021 | ||
5 | 5
service
Electronic Summons Issued
Tue 06/15 11:47 AM
SUMMONS (2) Issued Electronically as to CATHERINE SZPINDOR, WILLIAM J. WALKER. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) |
|
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Tue 06/15 11:16 AM
Case Assigned to Judge Timothy J. Kelly. (zsb) |
||
Monday, June 14, 2021 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Errata
Mon 06/14 4:09 PM
ERRATA Signature Added by ANDREW S. CLYDE, LOUIE GOHMERT re2 MOTION Use Business/Attorney Address filed by LOUIE GOHMERT, ANDREW S. CLYDE. (Mayfield, Earl) |
|
3 | 3
notice
LCvR 26.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests
Mon 06/14 12:10 AM
LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by ANDREW CLYDE, LOUIE GOHMERT (Mayfield, Earl) |
|
2 | 2
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Mon 06/14 12:05 AM
MOTION Use Business/Attorney Address by ANDREW CLYDE, LOUIE GOHMERT. (Mayfield, Earl) |
|
notice
Notice of QC- New Case
Mon 06/14 10:01 AM
NOTICE OF ERROR re2 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief; emailed to tmayfield@jurisday.com, cc'd 0 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. No signature. Please file the signed document using the event Errata. All filings must have an original signature or '/s/ Attorney Name' to represent an electronic signature of the filer., 2. COMPLIANCE DEADLINE is by close of business today. This case will not proceed any further until all errors are satisfied. (znmg, ) |
||
Sunday, June 13, 2021 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Sun 06/13 11:34 PM
COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8523296) filed by ANDREW CLYDE, LOUIE GOHMERT.(Mayfield, Earl) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summons Walker Summons, | ||
Att: 3 Summons Szpindor Summons |