|
GPO
Feb 14 2013
ORDER for status report regarding Phase III Bellwether Plaintiffs. Ordered by Judge Clay D. Land on 02/14/2013. (CGC)
|
|
GPO
May 23 2013
ORDER regarding instructions and issues for status conference scheduled for July 16, 2013. Ordered by Judge Clay D. Land on 05/23/2013. (CGC)Associated Cases: ALL
|
|
GPO
Aug 04 2015
ORDER denying 45 Motion for Summary Judgment. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND on 08/04/2015. (CGC)
|
|
GPO
Dec 03 2015
ORDER on the parties' motions in limine and joint motion for extension of time. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND on 12/03/2015. (CGC)
|
|
GPO
Feb 01 2016
ORDER granting in part and denying in part Mentor's Motion in Limine #3 to Limit Evidence to Only Substantially Similar Incidents (65 in 4:12-cv-00176-CDL, 66 in 4:13-cv-00042-CDL, 50 in 4:14-cv-00117-CDL). Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND on 02/01/2016. (CCL)
|
|
GPO
Feb 02 2016
ORDER regarding the parties' objections to deposition designations (99 in 4:12-cv-00176, 100 in 4:12-cv-00176, 94 in 4:13-cv-00042, 95 in 4:13-cv-00042, 75 in 4:14-cv-00117, 76 in 4:14-cv-00117). Please review Order carefully for additional deadlines. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND on 02/02/2016. (CCL)
|
|
GPO
Oct 20 2016
ORDER granting in part and denying in part 197. Defendant's motion for judgment as a matter of law, for a new trial, and to alter the judgment 197 is denied, except the judgment shall be reduced to $2,400,000. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND on 10/20/2016. (CCL)
|
|
GPO
Oct 25 2016
ORDER granting 196 Motion for Attorney Fees to the extent described in the Order; directing the Clerk to enter an Amended Final Judgment. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND on 10/25/2016. (CCL)
|