adidas America, Inc. et al v. Thom Browne, Inc.
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Jed S Rakoff |
Referred: | Robert W Lehrburger |
Case #: | 1:21-cv-05615 |
Nature of Suit | 840 Property Rights - Trademark |
Cause | 15:1125la Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act) |
Case Filed: | Jun 28, 2021 |
Terminated: | Jan 13, 2023 |
Last checked: Saturday Dec 25, 2021 4:56 AM EST |
Defendant
Thom Browne, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
adidas AG
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
adidas America, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/23/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, March 20, 2024 | ||
254 | 254
respoth
Reply (non-motion)
Wed 03/20 5:40 PM
***SELECTED PARTIES*** REPLY re:250 Brief,245 Order, Set Deadlines,, (SEALED - adidas's Reply with Regard to the Court's Feb. 28 Order for Supp. Briefing) . Document filed by adidas America, Inc., adidas AG, Thom Browne, Inc.. Motion or Order to File Under Seal:32 .(Henn, Richard) |
|
253 | 253
respoth
Reply (non-motion)
Wed 03/20 5:37 PM
REPLY re:249 Brief,245 Order, Set Deadlines,, (REDACTED - adidas's Reply with Regard to the Court's Feb. 28 Order for Supp. Briefing) . Document filed by adidas AG, adidas America, Inc...(Henn, Richard) |
|
252 | 252
misc
Brief
Wed 03/20 5:33 PM
***SELECTED PARTIES*** BRIEF re:248 Brief,245 Order, Set Deadlines,, (SEALED REPLY BRIEF) . Document filed by Thom Browne, Inc. (a Delaware corporation), adidas AG(a foreign entity), adidas America, Inc..Motion or Order to File Under Seal:32 .(Maldonado, Robert) |
|
251 | 251
misc
Brief
Wed 03/20 5:30 PM
BRIEF re:248 Brief (REDACTED REPLY BRIEF) . Document filed by Thom Browne, Inc. (a Delaware corporation)..(Maldonado, Robert) |
|
Wednesday, March 13, 2024 | ||
250 | 250
misc
Brief
Wed 03/13 5:40 PM
***SELECTED PARTIES***SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF re:245 Order, Set Deadlines,, . Document filed by Thom Browne, Inc. (a Delaware corporation), adidas AG(a foreign entity), adidas America, Inc..Motion or Order to File Under Seal:32 .(Maldonado, Robert) |
|
249 | 249
21
pgs
misc
Brief
Wed 03/13 5:37 PM
SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF re:245 Order, Set Deadlines,, . Document filed by Thom Browne, Inc. (a Delaware corporation)..(Maldonado, Robert) |
|
248 | 248
misc
Brief
Wed 03/13 4:24 PM
***SELECTED PARTIES***SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF re:245 Order, Set Deadlines,, (Sealed) . Document filed by adidas America, Inc., adidas AG, Thom Browne, Inc..Motion or Order to File Under Seal:32 .(Henn, Richard) |
|
247 | 247
misc
Brief
Wed 03/13 4:19 PM
SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF re:245 Order, Set Deadlines,, . Document filed by adidas AG, adidas America, Inc...(Henn, Richard) |