Sumners et al v. General Motors, LLC et al
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Jesse M Furman |
Case #: | 1:14-cv-05461 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1441pi Petition for Removal- Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Jul 21, 2014 |
Terminated: | Oct 21, 2015 |
Last checked: Saturday May 09, 2015 7:10 PM EDT |
ADR Provider
Ishmail Sesay
Gary Peller, Esq. Georgetown University Law Center 600 New Jersey Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC 20001 |
|
Defendant
AutoFair Chevrolet, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Fictitous Defendants A through D
|
|
Defendant
General Motors L.L.C.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Martha Dickey
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ishmail Sesay
Gary Peller, Esq. Georgetown University Law Center 600 New Jersey Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC 20001 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Tyson Sumners
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Delphi Automotive PLC
Terminated: 11/07/2014
|
|
Defendant
Delphi Automotive Systems, L.L.C.
Terminated: 11/07/2014
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Delphi Automotive, LLC
Terminated: 11/07/2014
|
Docket last updated: 04/17/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, February 17, 2022 | ||
325 | 325
order
Protective Order
Thu 02/17 2:15 PM
ORDER [Amending the Restrictions on Use of Confidential and Highly Confidential Information]. Defendants and Lead Counsel for plaintiffs having consented thereto, and for good cause shown, Order No. 10 Paragraph 7(a) (Docket No. 294), as amended by Order No. 103 (Docket No.2901), is further amended to state as follows (changes in italics) and as further set forth in this Order. In addition, Order No. 10 Paragraph 8 (Docket No. 294), as amended by Order No. 103 (Docket No. 2901), is further amended to state as follows (changes in italic) and as further set forth in this Order. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 2/17/22) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:14-md-02543-JMF et al. (yv) |