KHUSENOV v. PROKRAFT INC. et al
New York Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Hector Gonzalez |
Case #: | 1:21-cv-03703 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Jun 30, 2021 |
Terminated: | Feb 07, 2023 |
Last checked: Monday Dec 27, 2021 3:42 AM EST |
Counter Claimant
KARZINKA US, INC.
|
Represented By
|
Counter Defendant
Pro-Cut
|
Represented By
|
Counter Defendant
Prokraft Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Pro-Cut
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Prokraft Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Isojon Khusenov
|
Represented By
|
ThirdParty Defendant
KARZINKA US, INC.
64-46 108th Street
Forest Hills, NY 11375 |
Represented By
|
ThirdParty Plaintiff
Prokraft Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/23/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, March 27, 2024 | ||
63 | 63
appeal
USCA Mandate
Wed 03/27 11:54 AM
MANDATE of USCA as to61 Notice of Cross Appeal filed by Pro-Cut, Prokraft Inc. For the reasons set forth above, we conclude that Khusenovs claims were properly dismissed on summary judgment. Accordingly, we AFFIRM the District Courts Judgment. Issued as Mandate: 3/27/2024. USCA# 23-320. (VJ) |