Williams v. Dragone Classic Motorcars Inc
Connecticut District Court | |
Judge: | Sarah A L Merriam |
Case #: | 3:21-cv-00907 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract |
Case Filed: | Jul 01, 2021 |
Terminated: | Feb 08, 2022 |
Last checked: Tuesday Dec 28, 2021 4:19 AM EST |
Defendant
Dragone Classic Motor Cars Inc
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lester Williams
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Wednesday, March 30, 2022 | ||
34 | 34
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Wed 03/30 3:04 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal of Case by Lester Williams. (Hellman, Jeffrey) |
|
Tuesday, February 08, 2022 | ||
minutes
Settlement Conference
Tue 02/08 3:27 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert M. Spector: A Settlement Conference was held on 2/8/2022. The parties reached a settlement. Counsel will work together to memorialize their agreement in a formal settlement document and have been informed that the District Judge may elect to close the case administratively on the docket in the meantime. The parties have requested that any administrative closure order provide them with 60 days, or until April 8, 2022, to move to re-open the case, if necessary. Total Time: 5 hours and 20 minutes. (Briskin, Corey) |
||
order
Order
Tue 02/08 4:19 PM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE as settled. Judge Robert M. Spector has reported that the parties have reached a settlement of this matter. The Clerk is directed to close this case, without prejudice to reopening on or before April 8, 2022 . If the parties wish to file a stipulation of dismissal on the docket, they may do so on or before April 8, 2022, though no such stipulation is required. The deadlines set forth in this Order may be extended only for good cause shown, by a motion filed in full compliance with the Federal and Local Rules of Civil Procedure, including Local Rule 7(b). It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Sarah A. L. Merriam on 2/8/2022. (Teague, J.) |
||
notice
Judicial Evaluation Program Survey
Tue 02/08 4:34 PM
JUDICIAL PROCEEDINGS SURVEY - FOR COUNSEL ONLY: The following link to the confidential survey requires you to log into CM/ECF for SECURITY purposes. Once in CM/ECF you will be prompted for the case number. Although you are receiving this survey through CM/ECF, it is hosted on an independent website called SurveyMonkey. Once in SurveyMonkey, the survey is located in a secure account. The survey is not docketed and it is not sent directly to the judge. To ensure anonymity, completed surveys are held up to 90 days before they are sent to the judge for review. We hope you will take this opportunity to participate, please click on this link: https://ecf.ctd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/Dispatch.pl?survey (Caffrey, A.) |
||
Monday, January 17, 2022 | ||
30 | 30
misc
Status Report
Mon 01/17 12:01 PM
Joint STATUS REPORT by Lester Williams. (Hellman, Jeffrey) |
|
Sunday, January 16, 2022 | ||
31 | 31
5
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time
Tue 01/18 12:31 PM
ORDER granting29 Motion for Extension of Time of All Deadlines. The Court hereby issues the attached Revised Scheduling Order and Case Management Plan, extending the deadlines as requested. Counsel shall review the attached Order carefully, noting all final and interim deadlines, discovery procedures, and other matters . It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Sarah A. L. Merriam on 1/16/2022. (Teague, J.) |
|
utility
Set Deadlines/Hearings
Tue 01/18 1:52 PM
Set Deadlines: Discovery due by 5/2/2022; Dispositive Motions due by 10/21/2022; Joint Trial Memorandum due by 11/4/2022 (Caffrey, A.) |
||
Saturday, January 15, 2022 | ||
29 | 29
motion
Extension of Time
Sat 01/15 8:39 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time until of 30 days for all deadlines by Dragone Classic Motor Cars Inc. (Murnane, Edward) |
|
Thursday, December 02, 2021 | ||
28 | 28
3
pgs
order
Order
Thu 12/02 3:56 PM
ORDER: A Settlement Conference is scheduled in this case for February 8, 2022 at 10:00AM . Please see the attached Settlement Conference Order for detailed instructions and deadlines. Signed by Judge Robert M. Spector on 12/02/2021.(Kim, Jiwon) |
|
order
Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge
Thu 12/02 8:53 AM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Robert M. Spector for24 MOTION to Continue Settlement Conference Signed by Judge Sarah A. L. Merriam on 12/2/2021.Motion to Continue Settlement Conference referred to Robert M. Spector(Caffrey, A.) |
||
order
Order on Motion to Continue
Thu 12/02 3:50 PM
ORDER granting24 Motion to Continue. The Court has reluctantly granted this last-minute request for a continuance of the December 7, 2021 settlement conference and rescheduled the conference to February 8, 2022. No further continuances will be granted absent extraordinary circumstances, which would not include the reason given for this continuance. Signed by Judge Robert M. Spector on 12/02/2021. (Spector, Robert) |
||
utility
Calendar Entry
Thu 12/02 3:55 PM
NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE.ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. RESET FROM 12/07/2021 at 12:00PM At the parties' request, the Settlement Conference via Zoom is reset for 2/8/2022 at 10:00 AM before Judge Robert M. Spector. (Kim, Jiwon) |
||
Wednesday, December 01, 2021 | ||
24 | 24
motion
Continue
Wed 12/01 2:49 PM
MOTION to Continue Settlement Conference by Dragone Classic Motor Cars Inc. (Murnane, Edward) |
|
minutes
Settlement Conference
Wed 12/01 12:12 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert M. Spector: Telephonic Settlement Conference held on 12/1/2021. 11 minutes (Kim, Jiwon) |
||
Tuesday, November 30, 2021 | ||
utility
Calendar Entry
Tue 11/30 4:35 PM
NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE.ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. At the parties' request, a Telephonic Settlement Discussion is set for 12/01/2021 at 12:00 PM before Judge Robert M. Spector. Please use the following dial-in: (877) 873-8017; Access Code: 7040261. (Kim, Jiwon) |
||
Friday, October 29, 2021 | ||
21 | 21
3
pgs
order
Order
Fri 10/29 11:43 AM
ORDER: A Settlement Conference is scheduled in this case for December 7, 2021 at 12:00 pm. Please see the attached Settlement Conference Order for detailed instructions and deadlines. Signed by Judge Robert M. Spector on 10/29/2021.(Watson, M.) |
|
20 | 20
utility
Calendar Entry
Fri 10/29 11:41 AM
NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE.ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. A Settlement Conference via Zoom is set for 12/7/2021 at 12:00 PM before Judge Robert M. Spector. (Watson, M.) |
|
19 | 19
minutes
Pretrial Conference
Fri 10/29 11:39 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert M. Spector: Pre-settlement Conference held on 10/29/2021. 8 minutes (Watson, M.) |
|
Wednesday, October 20, 2021 | ||
18 | 18
utility
Calendar Entry
Wed 10/20 4:56 AM
NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE.ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. A Telephonic Pre-Settlement Conference is set for 10/29/2021 at 11:30 AM before Judge Robert M. Spector. A date for the settlement conference will be set during the telephone call. As the Court requires parties or their representatives with settlement authority to attend (in-person or by remote means) the settlement conference, counsel should obtain dates of unavailability from their clients over the next 90 days and have their own calendars available to aid in the scheduling. During the telephone call, counsel should be prepared to discuss what information needs to be exchanged and anything else that needs to be accomplished prior to the settlement conference for the discussions to be productive. Please use the following dial-in for this call: (877) 873-8017; Access Code: 7040261. (Kim, Jiwon) |
|
Tuesday, October 19, 2021 | ||
17 | 17
order
Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge
Tue 10/19 5:08 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Robert M. Spector for Settlement Conference Signed by Judge Sarah A. L. Merriam on 10/19/2021.(Caffrey, A.) |
|
16 | 16
order
Order
Tue 10/19 2:47 PM
ORDER. This Case is hereby REFERRED to a United States Magistrate Judge to determine whether settlement discussions, with the assistance of the Magistrate Judge, would be productive and, if the Magistrate Judge believes such discussions would be a productive use of Court time, to conduct such discussions. Signed by Judge Sarah A. L. Merriam on 10/19/2021. (Katz, S.) |
|
Monday, October 18, 2021 | ||
15 | 15
order
Scheduling Order
Mon 10/18 4:14 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER AND CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN: Fact Discovery due by 4/1/2022; Dispositive Motions due by 9/9/2022; Status Report due by 1/18/2022. Please see attached Scheduling Order for important details and deadlines, including the deadlines applicable to expert discovery. Signed by Judge Sarah A. L. Merriam on 10/18/2021. (Katz, S.) |
|
14 | 14
order
Order on Motion for More Definite Statement
Mon 10/18 1:39 PM
ORDER. Defendant's9 Motion for More Definite Statement is hereby DENIED, as moot, in light of plaintiff having filed an10 Amended Complaint addressing the concerns raised in defendant's motion, and defendant having now filed an11 Answer to the Amended Complaint. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Sarah A. L. Merriam on 10/18/2021. (Katz, S.) |
|
Thursday, October 14, 2021 | ||
13 | 13
order
Order of Transfer
Thu 10/14 6:24 PM
ORDER OF TRANSFER. Case reassigned to Judge Sarah A. L. Merriam for all further proceedings. Signed by Clerk on 10/14/2021.(Walker, J.) |
|
Tuesday, September 28, 2021 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting
Tue 09/28 1:08 PM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Hellman, Jeffrey) |
|
Thursday, September 16, 2021 | ||
11 | 11
answer
Answer to Amended Complaint
Thu 09/16 5:51 PM
ANSWER to10 Amended Complaint with Special Defenses. by Dragone Classic Motor Cars Inc.(Murnane, Edward) |
|
Wednesday, August 25, 2021 | ||
10 | 10
cmp
Amended Complaint
Wed 08/25 4:36 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Dragone Classic Motor Cars Inc, filed by Lester Williams.(Hellman, Jeffrey) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
Thursday, August 05, 2021 | ||
9 | 9
motion
More Definite Statement
Thu 08/05 5:39 PM
MOTION for More Definite Statement by Dragone Classic Motor Cars Inc.Responses due by 8/26/2021 (Murnane, Edward) |
|
8 | 8
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Thu 08/05 4:03 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Dragone Classic Motor Cars Inc. (Murnane, Edward) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 08/05 4:01 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Edward T. Murnane, Jr on behalf of Dragone Classic Motor Cars Inc (Murnane, Edward) |
|
Wednesday, July 21, 2021 | ||
6 | 6
service
Summons Returned Executed
Wed 07/21 12:45 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lester Williams. Dragone Classic Motor Cars Inc served on 7/15/2021, answer due 8/5/2021. (Hellman, Jeffrey) |
|
Tuesday, July 06, 2021 | ||
5 | 5
service
Electronic Summons Issued
Tue 07/06 4:04 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Dragone Classic Motor Cars Inc* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Jeffrey R. Hellman* *Law Offices of Jeffrey R. Hellman* *195 Church Street, 10th Floor* *New Haven, CT 06510*. (Freberg, B) |
|
4 | 4
order
Electronic Service Documents
Tue 07/06 3:33 PM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of1 Complaint, filed by Lester Williams,2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines,3 Electronic Filing Order Signed by Clerk on 76/2021.(Freberg, B) |
|
Friday, July 02, 2021 | ||
service
Request to Issue Summons
Fri 07/02 3:27 PM
Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Dragone Classic Motor Cars Inc. (Hellman, Jeffrey) |
||
Thursday, July 01, 2021 | ||
3 | 3
order
Electronic Filing Order
Tue 07/06 2:51 PM
ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Charles S. Haight, Jr on 7/1/2021.(Freberg, B) |
|
2 | 2
1
pgs
order
Order on Pretrial Deadlines
Tue 07/06 2:49 PM
Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 9/4/2021; Discovery due by 1/5/2022; Dispositive Motions due by 2/9/2022. Signed by Clerk on 7/1/2021.(Freberg, B) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 07/01 3:18 PM
COMPLAINT against Dragone Classic Motorcars Inc ( Filing fee $402 receipt number ACTDC-6564762.), filed by Lester Williams.(Hellman, Jeffrey) Modified on 7/1/2021 to correct parties (Hushin, Z.) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 5 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Thu 07/01 3:55 PM
Judge Charles S. Haight, Jr added. (Hushin, Z.) |