Mills v. Unnamed Defendant
Georgia Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Timothy C Batten, Sr |
Case #: | 1:14-cv-02316 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Jul 18, 2014 |
Terminated: | Nov 03, 2014 |
Last checked: Sunday May 10, 2015 5:11 PM EDT |
Defendant
Alissa Adams
|
|
Defendant
Tammy Hicks
|
|
Defendant
Unnamed Defendant
|
|
Defendant
Donna Weese
|
|
Plaintiff
Catherine A. Mills
1805 Fort Daniel's Trail
Dacula, GA 30019 |
Docket last updated: 3 hours ago |
Monday, November 03, 2014 | ||
12 | 12 CLERK'S JUDGMENT entered DISMISSING action for failure to obey a lawful order of the court pursuant to Local Rule 41.3. (jlm)--Please refer to http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov to obtain an appeals jurisdiction checklist-- | |
11 | 11 ORDER DENYING9 Motion for TRO and DISMISSING action for failure to obey a lawful order of the court. Signed by Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr on 11/3/14. (jlm) | |
Clerks Certificate of Mailing as to Catherine A. Mills re11 Order on Motion for TRO and Dismissal,12 Clerk's Judgment (jlm) | ||
Civil Case Terminated. (jlm) | ||
Friday, October 31, 2014 | ||
10 | 10 NOTICE Of Filing copy of ticket by Catherine A. Mills (jpa) | |
Wednesday, October 22, 2014 | ||
Submission of9 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, submitted to District Judge Timothy C. Batten. (jpa) | ||
Tuesday, October 21, 2014 | ||
9 | 9 (Filing construed by Clerk's office as) MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Catherine A. Mills. (jpa) | |
Tuesday, September 30, 2014 | ||
8 | 8 NOTICE Of Filing Attachments to7 Amended Complaint by Catherine A. Mills. (bdb) | |
Monday, September 08, 2014 | ||
7 | 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Unnamed Defendant, Tammy Hicks, Alissa Adams, Donna Weese filed by Catherine A. Mills.(bdb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. | |
Friday, September 05, 2014 | ||
6 | 6 ORDER denying5 Plaintiff's Motion to Appoint Counsel. Plaintiff advised to amend complaint on/before 9/12/14. Failure to follow instructions will result in dismissal of action pursuant to Local Rule 41.3. Signed by Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr on 9/3/14. (rsh) | |
Clerks Certificate of Mailing as to Catherine A. Mills re6 Order (rsh) | ||
Monday, August 25, 2014 | ||
Submission of5 MOTION to Appoint Counsel. Submitted to District Judge Timothy C. Batten. (bdb) | ||
Thursday, August 21, 2014 | ||
5 | 5 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Catherine A. Mills. (bdb) | |
Wednesday, August 06, 2014 | ||
4 | 4 ORDER that plaintiff shall, on or before 9/6/14, amend her complaint as set forth in this order. Failure to do so may result in dismissal of this action pursuant to Local Rule 41.3. Signed by Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr on 8/6/14. (jlm) | |
Clerks Certificate of Mailing as to Catherine A. Mills re4 Order. (jlm) | ||
Friday, July 25, 2014 | ||
3 | 3 NOTICE TO COUNSEL OF RECORD re2 Order Reassigning Case, (fap) | |
Clerks Certificate of Mailing as to Catherine A. Mills re3 Notice,2 Order Reassigning Case, (fap) | ||
Thursday, July 24, 2014 | ||
2 | 2 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr for all further proceedings. Judge Orinda D. Evans no longer assigned to case. NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD: The Judge designation in the civil action number assigned to this case has been changed to 1:14-cv-2316-TCB. Please make note of this change in order to facilitate the docketing of pleadings in this case. Signed by Judge Orinda D. Evans on 07/24/14. (fap) | |
Tuesday, July 22, 2014 | ||
Submission of1 Complaint for Review, submitted to District Judge Orinda D. Evans. (eop) | ||
Friday, July 18, 2014 | ||
1 | 1 COMPLAINT filed by Catherine A. Mills. ( Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 66542.)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |