BADER FAMILY FOUNDATION v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE
District Of Columbia District Court | |
Judge: | Christopher R Cooper |
Case #: | 1:21-cv-01846 |
Nature of Suit | 895 Other Statutes - Freedom of Information Act |
Cause | 05:552 Freedom of Information Act |
Case Filed: | Jul 12, 2021 |
Terminated: | Sep 20, 2021 |
Last checked: Saturday Jan 08, 2022 4:47 AM EST |
Defendant
UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
BADER FAMILY FOUNDATION
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/22/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, September 17, 2021 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Fri 09/17 4:14 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE. (Tilghman, Michael) |
|
order
.Order
Fri 09/17 4:30 PM
MINUTE ORDER: In light of the6 Stipulation of Dismissal, this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 9/17/2021. (lccrc3) |
||
Thursday, August 26, 2021 | ||
order
Status Report Order
Thu 08/26 2:09 PM
MINUTE ORDER: The Court has considered the parties' positions in the5 Joint Status Report. The parties are hereby directed to file a further Joint Status Report on or before September 24, 2021. If disputes remain at that time, the Joint Status Report shall include a proposed briefing schedule. So Ordered. Status Report due by 9/24/2021. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 08/26/2021. (lccrc3) |
||
Wednesday, August 25, 2021 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Status Report
Wed 08/25 2:26 PM
Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE. (Tilghman, Michael) |
|
Wednesday, August 11, 2021 | ||
4 | 4
answer
Answer to Complaint
Wed 08/11 1:39 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE.(Tilghman, Michael) |
|
order
.Order
Wed 08/11 2:41 PM
MINUTE ORDER: Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall promptly confer and file a joint proposed schedule for briefing or disclosure by August 25, 2021. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 08/11/2021. (lccrc3) |
||
Wednesday, July 21, 2021 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Returned Executed in FOIA case as to U.S. Attorney Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant Summons Returned Executed as to U.S. Attorney General
Wed 07/21 8:23 PM
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 7/12/2021. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 8/11/2021.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE served on 7/16/2021, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 7/19/2021. (Bader, Hans) |
|
Monday, July 12, 2021 | ||
2 | 2
service
Electronic Summons Issued as to AUSA,USAG
Mon 07/12 2:26 PM
SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General(adh, ) |
|
Att: 1 Notice and Consent | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 07/12 10:15 AM
COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8590576) filed by BADER FAMILY FOUNDATION.(Bader, Hans) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summons for the U.S. Attorney, | ||
Att: 3 Summons for the agency, USDA, | ||
Att: 4 Summons for the Attorney General | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Mon 07/12 1:36 PM
Case Assigned to Judge Christopher R. Cooper. (adh, ) |