Moskovits v. Federal Republic of Brazil
Original Case: 1:21-cv-04309
Second Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:21-cv-01691 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Case Filed: | Jul 12, 2021 |
Terminated: | Sep 20, 2021 |
Last checked: Tuesday Sep 21, 2021 4:33 AM EDT |
Defendant - Appellee
Federal Republic of Brazil
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
State of Santa Caterina, Brazil
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
State of Maranhao, Brazil
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
State of Mato Grosso, Brazil
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
Raimundo Colombo
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Jorge Siega
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Does 1 Through 10, inclusive
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
Celesc of Santa Catarina, Brazil
|
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Alexander Moskovits
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/21/2021 4:30 AM EDT |
Monday, July 12, 2021 | ||
1 | 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Alexander Moskovits, FILED. [3136567] 21-1691 [Entered: 07/13/2021 10:55 AM] | |
Att: 1 2 pgs Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax | ||
Att: 2 4 pgs Case FILED | ||
2 | 2 9 pgs DISTRICT COURT ORDER OF DISMISSAL, dated 06/14/2021, RECEIVED.[3136596] 21-1691 [Entered: 07/13/2021 11:09 AM] | |
3 | 3 1 pgs DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 06/14/2021, RECEIVED.[3136611] 21-1691 [Entered: 07/13/2021 11:15 AM] | |
4 | 4 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[3136616] 21-1691 [Entered: 07/13/2021 11:18 AM] | |
Att: 1 1 pgs Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed | ||
Att: 2 3 pgs Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED |