Gatsby Yacht Group, LLC v. M/Y "East Bound & Down
Original Case: 2:18-cv-04242
Second Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:21-cv-01704 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 120 Contract - Marine |
Case Filed: | Jul 13, 2021 |
Terminated: | Feb 02, 2022 |
Last checked: Thursday Feb 03, 2022 3:33 AM EST |
Defendant - Appellee
M/Y "East Bound & Down", A 2006 Azimut Benetti manufactured motorized 69.5 yacht, her boats, engines, tackle, equipment, apparel, furnishings, freights, appurtenances, and all fixtures and other necessaries there unto appertaining and belonging to the vess
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Matthew Proman
|
Represented By
|
Intervenor
SK Marine Electronics, Inc.
|
|
Intervenor
Maritime Diesel Electric, Inc., A 2006 Azimut Benetti manufactured motorized 69.5 yacht, her boats, engines, tackle, equipment, apparel, furnishings, freights, appurtenances, and all fixtures and other necessaries there unto appertaining and belonging to t
|
|
Intervenor
Lenmarine, Inc., DBA Bristol Marine, AKA Bristol Marine Somerset
|
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Gatsby Yacht Group, LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company, AKA Gatsby Enterprises, LLC, a Rhode Island Limited Libaility Company
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 02/03/2022 3:29 AM EST |
Tuesday, July 13, 2021 | ||
1 | 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Gatsby Yacht Group, LLC, FILED. [3137332] 21-1704 [Entered: 07/14/2021 09:25 AM] | |
Att: 1 2 pgs Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax | ||
Att: 2 25 pgs Case FILED | ||
2 | 2 24 pgs DISTRICT COURT ORDER, entered in the district court as docket entry dated 04/16/2021, RECEIVED.[3137348] 21-1704 [Entered: 07/14/2021 09:31 AM] | |
3 | 3 PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant Gatsby Yacht Group, LLC, district court receipt # ANYEDC-14651713, FILED.[3137349] 21-1704 [Entered: 07/14/2021 09:32 AM] | |
4 | 4 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[3137350] 21-1704 [Entered: 07/14/2021 09:33 AM] | |
Att: 1 1 pgs Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed | ||
Att: 2 26 pgs Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED |