Kellier v. Billups
Original Case: 1:21-cv-03921
Second Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:21-cv-01706 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Jul 13, 2021 |
Terminated: | Jan 13, 2022 |
Last checked: Friday Jan 14, 2022 3:30 AM EST |
Defendant - Appellee
Cheung
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Steve Banks
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Bill de Blasio
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Samaritan Village
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Coalition for the Homeless
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
NAICA Facility
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
DHS Facility
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Mr. Jackson
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Bently
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
Rodriguez
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Martin
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
Mr. Clinton
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
John Doe
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Mrs. Cruz
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Julius Doe
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Montanga
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Hyler
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Anthony Acosta
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
O'Mahoney
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Billups
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Joshua Kellier
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 01/14/2022 3:25 AM EST |
Tuesday, July 13, 2021 | ||
1 | 1 NOTICE OF INTERLOCUTORY CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Joshua Kellier, FILED. [3137465] 21-1706 [Entered: 07/14/2021 10:40 AM] | |
Att: 1 2 pgs Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax | ||
Att: 2 7 pgs Case FILED | ||
2 | 2 20 pgs DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 06/14/2021, RECEIVED.[3137480] 21-1706 [Entered: 07/14/2021 10:48 AM] | |
3 | 3 MOTION, to proceed in forma pauperis, on behalf of Appellant Joshua Kellier, FILED. Service date 07/13/2021 by No service.[3137486] 21-1706 [Entered: 07/14/2021 10:52 AM] | |
4 | 4 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[3137487] 21-1706 [Entered: 07/14/2021 10:53 AM] | |
Att: 1 1 pgs Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed | ||
Att: 2 4 pgs Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED |