Tonina v. Revenue Services
Original Case: 3:19-cv-00794
Second Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:21-cv-01707 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Jul 13, 2021 |
Terminated: | Sep 27, 2021 |
Last checked: Tuesday Sep 28, 2021 4:33 AM EDT |
Defendant - Appellee
Connecticut Department of Revenue Services
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Theresa Tonina
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/28/2021 4:30 AM EDT |
Tuesday, July 13, 2021 | ||
1 | 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Theresa Tonina, FILED. [3137417] 21-1707 [Entered: 07/14/2021 10:14 AM] | |
Att: 1 2 pgs Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax | ||
Att: 2 6 pgs Case FILED | ||
2 | 2 1 pgs DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 02/24/2020, RECEIVED.[3137427] 21-1707 [Entered: 07/14/2021 10:17 AM] | |
4 | 4 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[3137432] 21-1707 [Entered: 07/14/2021 10:19 AM] | |
Att: 1 1 pgs Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed | ||
Att: 2 10 pgs Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED |