Buchanan v. Pay-O-Matic Check Cashing Corp
Original Case: 2:18-cv-00885
Second Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:21-cv-01723 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act |
Case Filed: | Jul 13, 2021 |
Terminated: | Oct 08, 2021 |
Last checked: Monday Oct 11, 2021 4:30 AM EDT |
Defendant - Appellee
Pay-O-Matic Check Cashing Corp.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
The Pay-O-Matic Corp.
|
Represented By
|
Intervenor - Appellant
Carmen Luyando
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
David Buchanan, on behalf of himself, FLSA Collective Plaintiffs and the Class
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Eva Figueroa
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Javon Jones
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Daquan Colvin
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Nicole Williamson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Anna Singh
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Tetyana Goncharova
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 10/11/2021 4:28 AM EDT |
Tuesday, July 13, 2021 | ||
1 | 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Carmen Luyando, FILED. [3138400] 21-1723 [Entered: 07/15/2021 11:27 AM] | |
Att: 1 2 pgs Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax | ||
Att: 2 22 pgs Case FILED | ||
2 | 2 3 pgs DISTRICT COURT ORDER dated 03/25/2020, RECEIVED.[3138402] 21-1723 [Entered: 07/15/2021 11:31 AM] | |
3 | 3 6 pgs DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 06/15/2021, RECEIVED.[3138404] 21-1723 [Entered: 07/15/2021 11:32 AM] | |
4 | 4 PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant Carmen Luyando, USCA receipt # ANYEDC-14649143, FILED.[3138406] 21-1723 [Entered: 07/15/2021 11:33 AM] | |
5 | 5 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[3138408] 21-1723 [Entered: 07/15/2021 11:33 AM] | |
Att: 1 1 pgs Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed | ||
Att: 2 23 pgs Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED |