Hay v. New York Media LLC
Original Case: 1:20-cv-06135
Second Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:21-cv-01727 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 320 Torts - Personal Injury - Assault, Libel, & Slander |
Case Filed: | Jul 13, 2021 |
Terminated: | Mar 10, 2022 |
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 16, 2022 4:46 AM EDT |
Defendant
David Korzenik
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
New York Media LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Kera Bolonik
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Bruce Hay
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 03/16/2022 4:31 AM EDT |
Tuesday, July 13, 2021 | ||
1 | 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Bruce Hay, FILED. [3138879] 21-1727 [Entered: 07/15/2021 04:16 PM] | |
Att: 1 2 pgs Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax | ||
Att: 2 8 pgs Case FILED | ||
2 | 2 7 pgs DISTRICT COURT OPINION AND ORDER, dated 07/01/2021, RECEIVED.[3138894] 21-1727 [Entered: 07/15/2021 04:20 PM] | |
3 | 3 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[3138899] 21-1727 [Entered: 07/15/2021 04:20 PM] | |
Att: 1 1 pgs Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed | ||
Att: 2 7 pgs Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED |