Ashfield Health LLC v. Jacobson
Original Case: 3:21-cv-00417
Second Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:21-cv-01717 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Case Filed: | Jul 14, 2021 |
Terminated: | Oct 21, 2022 |
Last checked: Monday Oct 24, 2022 4:24 AM EDT |
Defendant
Angela Jacobson
|
|
Defendant
Allison Valentine
|
|
Defendant
Apollo Medical Communications, Inc.
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
Matthew Jacobson
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee-Cross-Appellant
Matthew Jacobson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Ashfield Health LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant-Cross-Appellee
Ashfield Health LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 10/24/2022 4:21 AM EDT |
Wednesday, July 14, 2021 | ||
1 | 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Ashfield Health LLC, FILED. [3138153] 21-1717 [Entered: 07/15/2021 09:22 AM] | |
Att: 1 2 pgs Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax | ||
Att: 2 12 pgs Case FILED | ||
2 | 2 23 pgs DISTRICT COURT RULING AND ORDER ON MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINTING ORDER AND PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION, dated 07/01/2021, RECEIVED.[3138166] 21-1717 [Entered: 07/15/2021 09:27 AM] | |
3 | 3 PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant Ashfield Health LLC, district court receipt # ACTDC-6577012, FILED.[3138170] 21-1717 [Entered: 07/15/2021 09:27 AM] | |
4 | 4 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[3138177] 21-1717 [Entered: 07/15/2021 09:29 AM] | |
Att: 1 1 pgs Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed | ||
Att: 2 25 pgs Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED |