Syfert v. City of Rome
Original Case: 6:19-cv-00775
Second Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:21-cv-01721 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Jul 15, 2021 |
Terminated: | Dec 16, 2021 |
Last checked: Friday Dec 17, 2021 3:37 AM EST |
Defendant - Appellee
City of Rome
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Mark Syfert
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Mark Scott Syfert
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 12/17/2021 3:31 AM EST |
Thursday, July 15, 2021 | ||
1 | 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Mark Syfert, FILED. [3138240] 21-1721 [Entered: 07/15/2021 09:59 AM] | |
Att: 1 2 pgs Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax | ||
Att: 2 14 pgs Case FILED | ||
2 | 2 9 pgs DISTRICT COURT ORDER, entered in the district court as docket entry #50 dated 06/01/2021, RECEIVED.[3138309] 21-1721 [Entered: 07/15/2021 10:33 AM] | |
3 | 3 9 pgs DISTRICT COURT ORDER entered in the district court as docket entry #51 dated 06/01/2021, RECEIVED.[3138310] 21-1721 [Entered: 07/15/2021 10:34 AM] | |
4 | 4 9 pgs DISTRICT COURT ORDER entered in the district court as docket entry #52 dated 06/01/2021, RECEIVED.[3138314] 21-1721 [Entered: 07/15/2021 10:36 AM] | |
5 | 5 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[3138318] 21-1721 [Entered: 07/15/2021 10:38 AM] | |
Att: 1 1 pgs Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed | ||
Att: 2 10 pgs Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED | ||
6 | 6 1 pgs INSTRUCTIONAL FORMS, to Pro Se litigant, SENT.[3138327] 21-1721 [Entered: 07/15/2021 10:43 AM] |