Tessema v. Environmental Protection Agenc
Original Case: 1:20-cv-09700
Second Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:21-cv-01729 |
Type | civil / united states |
Nature of Suit | 893 Other Statutes - Environmental Matters |
Case Filed: | Jul 14, 2021 |
Terminated: | Dec 16, 2021 |
Last checked: Friday Dec 17, 2021 3:35 AM EST |
Defendant - Appellee
United States Environmental Protection Agency
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Ezra Tessema
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 12/17/2021 3:30 AM EST |
Wednesday, July 14, 2021 | ||
1 | 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Ezra Tessema, FILED. [3139145] 21-1729 [Entered: 07/16/2021 10:07 AM] | |
Att: 1 2 pgs Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax | ||
Att: 2 7 pgs Case FILED | ||
2 | 2 8 pgs DISTRICT COURT OPINION AND ORDER, dated 06/29/2021, RECEIVED.[3139147] 21-1729 [Entered: 07/16/2021 10:11 AM] | |
3 | 3 1 pgs DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 06/29/2021, RECEIVED.[3139148] 21-1729 [Entered: 07/16/2021 10:11 AM] | |
4 | 4 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[3139151] 21-1729 [Entered: 07/16/2021 10:12 AM] | |
Att: 1 1 pgs Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed | ||
Att: 2 6 pgs Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED |