CBI Capital LLC v. Mullen
Original Case: 1:19-cv-05219
Second Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:21-cv-01731 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Case Filed: | Jul 14, 2021 |
Terminated: | Aug 30, 2021 |
Last checked: Tuesday Aug 31, 2021 4:33 AM EDT |
Defendant-Counter-Claimant - Appellee
Mike Mullen
|
Represented By
|
Defendant-Counter-Claimant - Appellee
Mike Mullen Energy Equipment Resource, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
CBI Capital LLC
|
Represented By
|
Third-Party-Defendant
Evan Claar
|
Docket last updated: 08/31/2021 4:30 AM EDT |
Wednesday, July 14, 2021 | ||
1 | 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant CBI Capital LLC, FILED. [3139440] 21-1731 [Entered: 07/16/2021 02:12 PM] | |
Att: 1 2 pgs Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax | ||
Att: 2 16 pgs Case FILED | ||
2 | 2 18 pgs DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 07/16/2021, RECEIVED.[3139447] 21-1731 [Entered: 07/16/2021 02:17 PM] | |
3 | 3 PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant CBI Capital LLC, district court receipt # ANYSDC-24787801, FILED.[3139453] 21-1731 [Entered: 07/16/2021 02:21 PM] | |
4 | 4 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[3139457] 21-1731 [Entered: 07/16/2021 02:22 PM] | |
Att: 1 1 pgs Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed | ||
Att: 2 16 pgs Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED |