Faehner v. Webcollex, LLC
Original Case: 1:20-cv-01562
Second Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:21-cv-01734 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit |
Case Filed: | Jul 16, 2021 |
Terminated: | Feb 18, 2022 |
Last checked: Monday Feb 21, 2022 3:25 AM EST |
Defendant - Appellee
Webcollex, LLC, DBA CKS Financial
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Maryellen Faehner
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 02/21/2022 3:25 AM EST |
Friday, July 16, 2021 | ||
1 | 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Maryellen Faehner, FILED. [3139805] 21-1734 [Entered: 07/19/2021 09:18 AM] | |
Att: 1 2 pgs Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax | ||
Att: 2 5 pgs Case FILED | ||
2 | 2 9 pgs DISTRICT COURT MEMORANDUM AND ORDER, dated 06/22/2021, RECEIVED.[3139814] 21-1734 [Entered: 07/19/2021 09:22 AM] | |
3 | 3 1 pgs DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 06/23/2021, RECEIVED.[3139818] 21-1734 [Entered: 07/19/2021 09:23 AM] | |
4 | 4 PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant Maryellen Faehner, district court receipt # ANYEDC-14665783, FILED.[3139821] 21-1734 [Entered: 07/19/2021 09:24 AM] | |
5 | 5 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[3139971] 21-1734 [Entered: 07/19/2021 10:57 AM] | |
Att: 1 1 pgs Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed | ||
Att: 2 4 pgs Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED |