United States of America v. Catholic Health System of Long
Original Case: 1:12-cv-04425
Second Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:21-cv-01745 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 790 Labor - Other Labor Litigation |
Case Filed: | Jul 20, 2021 |
Terminated: | Jul 21, 2021 |
Last checked: Wednesday Jul 21, 2021 4:22 AM EDT |
Defendant
St. Catherine of Siena Nursing Home
|
|
Defendant
Good Samaritan Hospital Medical Center
|
|
Defendant
Good Samaritan Nursing Home
|
|
Defendant - Appellant
Catholic Health System of Long Island Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellant
St. Catherine of Siena Medical Center, DBA Catholic Health Services of Long Island
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
United States of America, Ex Rel, Michael Quartaro
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
State of New York
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 07/21/2021 4:16 AM EDT |
Tuesday, July 20, 2021 | ||
1 | 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Catholic Health System of Long Island Inc. and St. Catherine of Siena Medical Center, FILED. [3140961] 21-1745 [Entered: 07/20/2021 03:08 PM] | |
Att: 1 2 pgs Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax | ||
Att: 2 78 pgs Case FILED | ||
2 | 2 30+ pgs DISTRICT COURT MEMORANDUM AND ORDER, dated 07/13/2020, RECEIVED.[3140970] 21-1745 [Entered: 07/20/2021 03:12 PM] | |
3 | 3 23 pgs DISTRICT COURT MEMORANDUM AND ORDER, dated 02/22/2021, RECEIVED.[3140972] 21-1745 [Entered: 07/20/2021 03:13 PM] | |
5 | 5 NOTE: See lead case, 21-1534 containing complete set of docket entries.[3140981] 21-1745 [Entered: 07/20/2021 03:17 PM] |