Steiner et al v. eBay Inc. et al
Massachusetts District Court | |
Judge: | Patti B Saris |
Case #: | 1:21-cv-11181 |
Nature of Suit | 470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Racketeering (RICO) Act |
Case Filed: | Jul 21, 2021 |
Last checked: Monday Jan 17, 2022 3:25 AM EST |
Defendant
Philip Cooke
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Attorney John & Jane Does
|
|
Defendant
Brian Gilbert
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
David Harville
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Stephanie Popp
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Progressive F.O.R.C.E. Concepts, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
James Baugh
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
eBay Inc.
2025 Hamilton Ave
San Jose, CA 01863 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Stephanie Stockwell
|
|
Defendant
Devin Wenig
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Steven Wymer
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Veronica Zea
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Steiner Associates, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ina Steiner
11 Waban Street
Natick, MA 01760 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
David Steiner
11 Waban Street
Natick, MA 01760 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 3 hours ago |
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
360 | 360
2
pgs
notice
Notice - Other
Tue 04/16 11:57 AM
NOTICE by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA of Non-Objection to Discovery Responses (Edelman, Christopher) |
|
Thursday, April 11, 2024 | ||
359 | 359
2
pgs
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 04/11 8:51 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Kimberly Iverson on behalf of Progressive F.O.R.C.E. Concepts, LLC (Iverson, Kimberly) |
|
Wednesday, April 10, 2024 | ||
358 | 358
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Modification
Wed 04/10 4:39 PM
Judge Patti B. Saris: ENDORSED ORDER entered ALLOWED re357 Assented to Motion to Modify Scheduling Order. Deadline for serving requests for admission extended up to and including 5/29/2024.(Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde) |