Jurist v. The Long Island Power Authorit
Original Case: 2:19-cv-03762
Second Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:21-cv-01755 |
Type | civil / united states |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Case Filed: | Jul 19, 2021 |
Terminated: | Aug 08, 2022 |
Last checked: Tuesday Aug 09, 2022 4:29 AM EDT |
Defendant
New York State Department of Environmental Conservation, ("NYS DEC")
|
|
Defendant
Basil Seggos, Commissioner of New York State Department of Environmental Conservation
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
Power Authority of the State of New York
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
New York State Energy Research and Development Authority
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
New York State Energy Research and Development Agency
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
New York State Department of State
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
The Bureau of Ocean Energy Management
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Basil Seggos, Commissoner of New York State Department of Enviornmental Conservation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
New York State Department of Environmental Conservation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
New York State Office of Parks, Recreation and Historic Preservation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Erik Kulleseid, Commissioner of the New York State Office of Parks Recreation and Historic Preservation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Long Island Power Authority
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Herbert H. Jurist
|
|
Plaintiff
Marie Ryan
|
|
Plaintiff
Linda Jurist
|
|
Plaintiff
Lawrence Ryan
|
|
Plaintiff
Susan Johnson
|
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Steve Walter
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Robert Slawski
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Alena Walters
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Donald Powers
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 08/09/2022 4:27 AM EDT |
Monday, July 19, 2021 | ||
1 | 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellants Donald Powers, Robert Slawski, Steve Walter and Alena Walters, FILED. [3141699] 21-1755 [Entered: 07/21/2021 01:51 PM] | |
Att: 1 2 pgs Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax | ||
Att: 2 17 pgs Case FILED | ||
2 | 2 2 pgs DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 05/17/2021, RECEIVED.[3141702] 21-1755 [Entered: 07/21/2021 01:56 PM] | |
3 | 3 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[3141704] 21-1755 [Entered: 07/21/2021 01:57 PM] | |
Att: 1 1 pgs Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed | ||
Att: 2 16 pgs Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED |