Golubow v. Long Island Railroad
Original Case: 2:17-cv-00467
Second Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:21-cv-01759 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 330 Torts - Personal Injury - Federal Employers’ Liability |
Case Filed: | Jul 19, 2021 |
Terminated: | Aug 24, 2021 |
Last checked: Wednesday Aug 25, 2021 4:37 AM EDT |
Defendant - Appellee
Long Island Railroad, DBA MTA Long Island Railroad
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
David Golubow
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 08/25/2021 4:29 AM EDT |
Monday, July 19, 2021 | ||
1 | 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant David Golubow, FILED. [3141736] 21-1759 [Entered: 07/21/2021 02:40 PM] | |
Att: 1 2 pgs Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax | ||
Att: 2 12 pgs Case FILED | ||
2 | 2 12 pgs DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 07/07/2021, RECEIVED.[3141748] 21-1759 [Entered: 07/21/2021 02:45 PM] | |
3 | 3 1 pgs DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 07/08/2021, RECEIVED.[3141754] 21-1759 [Entered: 07/21/2021 02:48 PM] | |
4 | 4 PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant David Golubow, district court receipt # ANYEDC14668850, FILED.[3141764] 21-1759 [Entered: 07/21/2021 02:55 PM] | |
5 | 5 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[3141765] 21-1759 [Entered: 07/21/2021 02:56 PM] | |
Att: 1 1 pgs Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed | ||
Att: 2 12 pgs Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED |