Petroceli v. Varengold
Original Case: 1:21-cv-01212
Second Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:21-cv-01765 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Jul 21, 2021 |
Terminated: | Oct 13, 2021 |
Last checked: Thursday Oct 14, 2021 4:34 AM EDT |
Petitioner - Appellant
Domingos Lugao Petroceli
|
Represented By
|
Respondent - Appellee
Varengold
|
Docket last updated: 10/14/2021 4:31 AM EDT |
Wednesday, July 21, 2021 | ||
1 | 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Domingos Lugao Petroceli, FILED. [3142044] 21-1765 [Entered: 07/22/2021 08:37 AM] | |
Att: 1 2 pgs Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax | ||
Att: 2 12 pgs Case FILED | ||
2 | 2 1 pgs DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 05/04/2021, RECEIVED.[3142048] 21-1765 [Entered: 07/22/2021 08:41 AM] | |
3 | 3 1 pgs DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 05/04/2021, RECEIVED.[3142049] 21-1765 [Entered: 07/22/2021 08:41 AM] | |
4 | 4 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[3142050] 21-1765 [Entered: 07/22/2021 08:42 AM] | |
Att: 1 1 pgs Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed | ||
Att: 2 3 pgs Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED |