Kellier v. MMS
Original Case: 1:20-cv-10939
Second Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:21-cv-01770 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Jul 21, 2021 |
Terminated: | Dec 09, 2021 |
Last checked: Friday Dec 10, 2021 3:35 AM EST |
Defendant
New York State Office of Temporary and Disability Assistance
|
|
Defendant
The State
|
|
Defendant
Mrs. Marshall
|
|
Defendant
Mrs. Sonalis
|
|
Defendant
Mrs. Salocumb
|
|
Defendant
Mrs. Malarky
|
|
Defendant
Mr. Garcia
|
|
Defendant
Of Kevin
|
|
Defendant
Mr. CC
|
|
Defendant
Mrs. Karlwood
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
New York City Parks Department
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Bill/John Doe
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
Pathway Career Maximus
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Mr. Gabriel, HRS Representative
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Craig Mitchell Friedman
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Avant Business Services
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Judge Marshall
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Kenneth Lo
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Fedcap
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Manhattan Mini Storage
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Kurwin Kurtwood
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Grant Associates
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
Steven Banks
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
New York State Office of Temporary and Disability Assistance
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Human Resource Administration
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Mrs. Taylor
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Mr. Delroy, General Manager
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Joshua Kellier
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 12/10/2021 3:32 AM EST |
Wednesday, July 21, 2021 | ||
1 | 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Joshua Kellier, FILED. [3142272] 21-1770 [Entered: 07/22/2021 10:57 AM] | |
Att: 1 2 pgs Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax | ||
Att: 2 6 pgs Case FILED | ||
2 | 2 8 pgs DISTRICT COURT ORDER OF DISMISSAL, dated 05/13/2021, RECEIVED.[3142277] 21-1770 [Entered: 07/22/2021 11:04 AM] | |
3 | 3 MOTION, to proceed in forma pauperis, on behalf of Appellant Joshua Kellier, FILED. No service date.[3142281] 21-1770 [Entered: 07/22/2021 11:05 AM] | |
4 | 4 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[3142317] 21-1770 [Entered: 07/22/2021 11:32 AM] | |
Att: 1 1 pgs Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed | ||
Att: 2 6 pgs Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED |