John Doe 1 v. East Side Club, LLC
Original Case: 1:18-cv-11324
Second Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:21-cv-01771 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Case Filed: | Jul 21, 2021 |
Terminated: | May 18, 2022 |
Last checked: Thursday May 19, 2022 4:33 AM EDT |
Appellant
Derek Smith Law Group, PLLC
|
Represented By
|
Appellant
Johnmack Cohen
|
Represented By
|
Defendant-Counter-Claimant - Appellee
East Side Club, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant-Counter-Claimant - Appellee
John Doe 2
|
Represented By
|
Defendant-Counter-Claimant - Appellee
John Doe 3
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff-Counter-Defendant
John Doe 1
|
Docket last updated: 05/19/2022 4:31 AM EDT |
Wednesday, July 21, 2021 | ||
1 | 1 NOTICE OF INTERLOCUTORY CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Johnmack Cohen and Derek Smith Law Group, PLLC, FILED. [3142313] 21-1771 [Entered: 07/22/2021 11:29 AM] | |
Att: 1 2 pgs Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax | ||
Att: 2 26 pgs Case FILED | ||
2 | 2 30+ pgs DISTRICT COURT OPINION AND ORDER, dated 07/01/2021, RECEIVED.[3142320] 21-1771 [Entered: 07/22/2021 11:35 AM] | |
3 | 3 PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant Johnmack Cohen and Derek Smith Law Group, PLLC, district court receipt # ANYSDC-24823310, FILED.[3142325] 21-1771 [Entered: 07/22/2021 11:36 AM] | |
4 | 4 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[3142326] 21-1771 [Entered: 07/22/2021 11:36 AM] | |
Att: 1 1 pgs Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed | ||
Att: 2 27 pgs Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED |