Nuance Communications, Inc. v. International Business Machine
Original Case: 7:16-cv-05173
Second Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:21-cv-01758 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Case Filed: | Jul 21, 2021 |
Terminated: | Dec 19, 2022 |
Last checked: Tuesday Dec 20, 2022 3:29 AM EST |
Defendant - Appellee
International Business Machines Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Nuance Communications, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 12/20/2022 3:28 AM EST |
Wednesday, July 21, 2021 | ||
1 | 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Nuance Communications, Inc., FILED. [3142207] 21-1758 [Entered: 07/22/2021 10:25 AM] | |
Att: 1 2 pgs Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax | ||
Att: 2 33 pgs Case FILED | ||
2 | 2 1 pgs DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 06/21/2021, RECEIVED.[3142213] 21-1758 [Entered: 07/22/2021 10:28 AM] | |
3 | 3 PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant Nuance Communications, Inc., district court receipt # ANYSDC-24820856, FILED.[3142215] 21-1758 [Entered: 07/22/2021 10:28 AM] |