Fauquet v. Children and Families
Original Case: 3:20-cv-00335
Second Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:21-cv-01774 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Jul 22, 2021 |
Terminated: | Dec 27, 2021 |
Last checked: Tuesday Dec 28, 2021 3:26 AM EST |
Defendant - Appellee
Connecticut State Department of Children and Families
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
John E. Driscoll, Waterford Juvenille Court Judge
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Ryan Ziowaski, Attorney
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
Peter Catania, Attorney
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Priscilla F. Hammond, Attorney
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Stephen Vitelli
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Kirsten Fauquet, Church
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 12/28/2021 3:22 AM EST |
Thursday, July 22, 2021 | ||
1 | 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Kirsten Fauquet, FILED. [3142577] 21-1774 [Entered: 07/22/2021 02:46 PM] | |
Att: 1 2 pgs Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax | ||
Att: 2 4 pgs Case FILED | ||
2 | 2 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[3142580] 21-1774 [Entered: 07/22/2021 02:50 PM] | |
Att: 1 1 pgs Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed | ||
Att: 2 8 pgs Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED | ||
6 | 6 1 pgs NOTICE, re: pending district court IFP motion, to district court, copy to pro se appellant, SENT.[3142592] 21-1774 [Entered: 07/22/2021 02:55 PM] | |
7 | 7 1 pgs INSTRUCTIONAL FORMS, to Pro Se Appellant, SENT.[3142595] 21-1774 [Entered: 07/22/2021 02:57 PM] | |
8 | 8 NON-ADMITTED ATTORNEY, Peter Catania, Esq. for Appellee Peter Catania, Priscilla F. Hammond, Esq. for Appellee Priscilla F. Hammond and Stephen Vitelli, Esq. for Appellee Stephen Vitelli, orally informed to apply for admission forthwith and submit Addendum A to Notice of Appearance, NOTIFIED.[3142607] 21-1774 [Entered: 07/22/2021 03:04 PM] |