Erica Hart v. Movement Mortgage, LLC
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Josephine L Staton |
Referred: | Paul L Abrams |
Case #: | 8:14-cv-01168 |
Nature of Suit | 710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act |
Cause | 28:1441 Notice of Removal - Labor/Mgmnt. Relations |
Case Filed: | Jul 24, 2014 |
Terminated: | Dec 06, 2016 |
Last checked: Wednesday May 13, 2015 1:03 AM PDT |
Defendant
Does
|
|
Defendant
Movement Mortgage, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Erica Hart
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/24/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Tuesday, December 06, 2016 | ||
53 | 53
3
pgs
judgmentCV
Judgment
Tue 12/06 10:21 PM
JUDGMENT by Judge Josephine L. Staton (See document for information) (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (mt) |
|
Friday, December 02, 2016 | ||
52 | 52
notice
Notice of Lodging
Fri 12/02 9:36 AM
NOTICE OF LODGING filed re Order on Motion for Attorney Fees,,,, Order on Motion for Settlement,,,51(Phelps, Marc) |
|
Att: 1 [Proposed] Judgment | ||
Wednesday, November 30, 2016 | ||
51 | 51
order
Attorney Fees Settlement
Wed 11/30 11:14 AM
ORDER by Judge Josephine L. Staton granting43 MOTION for Attorney Fees. ; granting45 MOTION for Settlement. The Court finds the settlement to be fair, adequate, and reasonable, and accordingly GRANTS final approval of the settlement. The Court also GRANTS Plaintiff's motion for attorneys' fees, costs, and service payments. The Court awards Class Counsel $6,626.83 in litigation costs and $172,500 in attorneys' fees, based on an award of 25% of the Maximum Settlement Amount. The Court also awards a service payment of $5,000 to Hart. Finally, the Court awards $9,013.45 in claims administration services and expenses to ILYM. Distribution of the settlement fund to class and collective action members shall be made in accordance with the method outlined in the settlement. Plaintiffs shall file a proposed judgment forthwith. (see document for details). (dro) |